Global Patent Index - EP 1955788 A3

EP 1955788 A3 2009-02-25 - Roll profiled component and procedure for its manufacture

Title (en)

Roll profiled component and procedure for its manufacture

Title (de)

Rollprofiliertes Bauteil und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Composant profilé à rouleaux et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1955788 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 08002028 A

Priority

DE 102007005880 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1955788A2] The component has two individual parts (1, 2) including vertical sections (4, 4'), where the component has a height that is changeable over a longitudinal axis of the component. The individual parts are connected with each other by laser welding. Each individual part has a breadth that is changeable over a longitudinal axis of the part. The individual parts are sectioned at inner edges (6, 6 ') of the parts. An independent claim is also included for a method for manufacturing a component using a roll forming component.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/08 (2006.01); B21D 53/88 (2006.01); B23K 26/20 (2006.01); B62D 21/00 (2006.01); B62D 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/08 (2013.01); B21D 53/88 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1955788 A2 20080813; EP 1955788 A3 20090225; EP 1955788 B1 20100616; DE 102007005880 A1 20080807; DE 102007005880 B4 20091029; DE 502008000781 D1 20100729; ES 2345796 T3 20101001

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160205

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2018-02-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170727 AND 20170802

2017-08-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: DURA AUTOMOTIVE BODY & GLASS SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20170629

2017-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-01-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DURA AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS U.K., LTD., CASTLE VA, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DURA AUTOMOTIVE BODY & GLASS SYSTEMS GMBH, 58840 PLETTENBERG, DE

- Document: DE 502008000781

2017-01-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502008000781

- Representative's name: LORENZ SEIDLER GOSSEL RECHTSANWAELTE PATENTANW, DE

2016-11-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160204

2016-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 8

2015-04-30 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20150206

- Year of fee payment: 8

2011-07-07 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008000781

- Effective date: 20110316

2011-05-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110317

2010-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2345796 T3

2010-07-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502008000781 P 20100729

2010-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CZ DE ES FR GB

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CZ DE ES FR GB

2009-05-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090427

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B21D 5/08 20060101AFI20080514BHEP

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B21D 53/88 20060101ALI20090116BHEP

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B23K 26/20 20060101ALI20090116BHEP

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B62D 25/00 20060101ALI20090116BHEP

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B62D 21/00 20060101ALI20090116BHEP

2008-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080812

2008-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS