Global Patent Index - EP 1958110 A4

EP 1958110 A4 2009-02-04 - METHOD FOR AUTHORING LOCATION-BASED WEB CONTENTS, AND APPAPATUS AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING LOCATION-BASED WEB DATA SERVICE IN DIGITAL MOBILE TERMINAL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR AUTHORING LOCATION-BASED WEB CONTENTS, AND APPAPATUS AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING LOCATION-BASED WEB DATA SERVICE IN DIGITAL MOBILE TERMINAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ERSTELLEN VON AUF STANDORT BASIERENDEN WEB-INHALTEN UND VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERHALTEN EINES AUF STANDORT BASIERENDEN WEB-DATENDIENSTES IN EINEM DIGITALEN MOBILEN ENDGERÄT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CREATION DE CONTENUS DU WEB A BASE DE LIEUX ET APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE RECEPTION D'UN SERVICE DE DONNEES WEB A BASE DE LIEUX DANS UN TERMINAL MOBILE

Publication

EP 1958110 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 06824088 A

Priority

  • KR 2006005382 W
  • KR 20050121170 A
  • KR 20060094379 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007067022A1] Provided are a method for authoring location based web contents, and an apparatus and method for receiving a location based web data service in a digital mobile terminal. The method for authoring location-based web contents, includes the steps of authoring a voice web document related to a location by using a voice-based web markup language, putting a location information-related tag inside the voice web document, to thereby create a location-related voice web document, authoring a graphic web document related to a location by using a graphic-based web markup language (e.g., HyperText Markup Language), and integrating the location-related voice web document with the graphic web document.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 19/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/3087 (2013.01); G06F 17/30899 (2013.01); H04M 3/42348 (2013.01); H04M 2207/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007067022 A1 20070614; EP 1958110 A1 20080820; EP 1958110 A4 20090204; KR 100818934 B1 20080404; KR 20070061312 A 20070613

INPADOC legal status


2014-12-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140701

2012-08-01 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091013

2009-02-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090109

2009-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 19/00 20060101AFI20070806BHEP

2009-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 17/30 20060101ALI20081230BHEP

2008-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080523

2008-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR