EP 1959080 B1 20171227 - Fitting for a sliding leaf of a door or window
Title (en)
Fitting for a sliding leaf of a door or window
Title (de)
Beschlag für einen Schiebeflügel von Fenster oder Tür
Title (fr)
Butée de battant mobile de fenêtre ou de porte
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 102007008058 A 20070215
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1959080A2] The fitting has a drive rod mounted in the fold space of the panel that can be moved by a grip element with lower running carriages movable on running rails (44) fixed to the panel frame and upper sliding elements (29) that can slide on slide rails (41) fixed to the door or window frame. An independent claim is also included for a method of mounting or moving a sliding door or window panel.
IPC 8 full level
E05D 15/10 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
E05D 15/1013 (2013.01); E05F 11/145 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)
Citation (examination)
DE 3234677 A1 19840322 - GRETSCH UNITAS GMBH [DE]
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : Gretsch-Unitas GmbH Baubeschläge
- EP 0916794 A2 19990519 - VELUX IND AS [DK]
- DE 2700598 A1 19780713 - FUHR C FA
- DE 3234677 C2 19861023
- EP 0619410 A1 19941012 - HAUTAU GMBH W [DE]
- EP 1076147 A2 20010214 - WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]
- EP 0045009 A1 19820203 - GRETSCH UNITAS GMBH [DE]
- DE 3317264 A1 19841004 - WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]
- WO 2005071199 A1 20050804 - RAMSAUER DIETER [DE]
- DE 1957568 A1 19710519 - FRANK GMBH WILH
- DE 3342661 A1 19850605 - FUHR CARL GMBH & CO [DE]
- EP 0297202 A1 19890104 - SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]
- EP 0201717 A2 19861120 - GRETSCH UNITAS GMBH [DE]
- US 3841024 A 19741015 - CHENG A
- EP 1555368 A1 20050720 - GRETSCH UNITAS GMBHBAUBESCHLAE [DE]
- DE 20003168 U1 20000511 - ESCO METALLBAUBESCHLAG HANDEL GMBH [DE]
- DE 3638784 A1 19880601 - SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]
- "PSK PORTAL", BROSCHÜRE SIEGENIA, 17 January 2007 (2007-01-17), XP055475559
- "PSK PORTAL 160", ANSCHLAGANLEITUNG SIEGENIA, October 2004 (2004-10-01), pages 1 - 20, XP055521439
- "Maco-Rail-Systems", MACO ANSCHLAGANLEITUNG, March 2005 (2005-03-01), XP055475629
- "Lust auf sonnenklare Ausichten?", KUNDENPROSPEKT MACO-RAIL-SYSTEMS, February 2006 (2006-02-01), XP055475673
- "Maco Multi-Trend", MACO KATALOG, 2005, pages 12 - 13, XP055475688
- "Roto Patio 4150 S Alu", EINBAUANLEITUNG, July 2016 (2016-07-01), pages 1 - 24, XP055521427
Opponent : Roto Frank AG
- EP 0045009 A1 19820203 - GRETSCH UNITAS GMBH [DE]
- DE 3317264 A1 19841004 - WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]
- WO 2005071199 A1 20050804 - RAMSAUER DIETER [DE]
- DE 1957568 A1 19710519 - FRANK GMBH WILH
- DE 3342661 A1 19850605 - FUHR CARL GMBH & CO [DE]
- EP 0297202 A1 19890104 - SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]
- DE 3234677 C2 19861023
- EP 0201717 A2 19861120 - GRETSCH UNITAS GMBH [DE]
- US 3841024 A 19741015 - CHENG A
- EP 1555368 A1 20050720 - GRETSCH UNITAS GMBHBAUBESCHLAE [DE]
- DE 20003168 U1 20000511 - ESCO METALLBAUBESCHLAG HANDEL GMBH [DE]
- DE 3638784 A1 19880601 - SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]
- SIEGENIA: "Broschüre", PSK PORTAL, 17 January 2007 (2007-01-17), pages 1 - 4, XP 055475559
- ANONYMOUS: "PSK PORTAL 160", SIEGENIA ANSCHLAGANLEITUNG, October 2004 (2004-10-01), XP055521439
- "Schiebekipp-Beschlage I Standard I Kunststoff Tilt and Slide Fittings I Standard I PVCu Ferrures pour coulissants a translations I Standard I PVC Schuifkiep-Beslag I Standaard I PVC", MACO-RAIL-SYSTEM, March 2005 (2005-03-01), pages 1 - 38, XP 055475629
- "lust auf sonnenklare ausichten", MACO-RAIL-SYSTEM, February 3006 (3006-02-01), pages 1 - 16, XP 055475673
- "Katalog", MACO MULTI-TREND, 2005, pages 1 - 5, XP 055475688
- VORLÄUFIGE MEINUNG DER BESCHWERDEKAMMER
- "Roto Patio 4150 S Alu", ROTO FRANK AG - EINBAUANLEITUNG, July 2006 (2006-07-01), pages 1 - 24, XP 055521427
Opponent : SIEGENIA-AUBI KG
- EP 0045009 A1 19820203 - GRETSCH UNITAS GMBH [DE]
- DE 3317264 A1 19841004 - WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]
- WO 2005071199 A1 20050804 - RAMSAUER DIETER [DE]
- DE 1957568 A1 19710519 - FRANK GMBH WILH
- DE 3342661 A1 19850605 - FUHR CARL GMBH & CO [DE]
- EP 0297202 A1 19890104 - SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]
- DE 3234677 C2 19861023
- EP 0201717 A2 19861120 - GRETSCH UNITAS GMBH [DE]
- US 3841024 A 19741015 - CHENG A
- EP 1555368 A1 20050720 - GRETSCH UNITAS GMBHBAUBESCHLAE [DE]
- DE 20003168 U1 20000511 - ESCO METALLBAUBESCHLAG HANDEL GMBH [DE]
- DE 3638784 A1 19880601 - SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]
- EP 0275359 B1 19901114
- DE 60029154 T2 20070531 - GIOVANNETTI ANTONIO [IT]
- DE 2643854 A1 19780330 - LINKE HOFMANN BUSCH
- ANONYMOUS: "PSK PORTAL 160", SIEGENIA ANSCHLAGANLEITUNG, October 2004 (2004-10-01), pages 1 - 20, XP055521439
- SIEGENIA: "PSK PORTAL", SIEGENIA BROSCHÜRE, 17 January 2007 (2007-01-17), pages 1 - 4, XP055475559
- ANONYMOUS: "Schiebekipp-Beschlage I Standard I Kunststoff Tilt and Slide Fittings I Standard I PVCu Ferrures pour coulissants a translations I Standard I PVC Schuifkiep-Beslag I Standaard I PVC", ANSCHLAGANLEITUNG MACO-RAIL-SYSTEM, March 2005 (2005-03-01), pages 1 - 38, XP055475629
- ANONYMOUS: "lust auf sonnenklare ausichten", MACO-RAIL-SYSTEM, February 2006 (2006-02-01), pages 1 - 16, XP055475673
- "Maco Multi-Trend", MACO KATALOG 2005, 2005, pages 1 - 5, XP055475688
- ANONYMOUS: "Roto Patio 4150 S Alu", ROTO FRANK AG - EINBAUANLEITUNG, July 2016 (2016-07-01), pages 1 - 24, XP055521427
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1959080 A2 20080820; EP 1959080 A3 20110525; EP 1959080 B1 20171227; DE 202008018015 U1 20120109; DE 202008018448 U1 20140110; EP 3216958 A1 20170913; EP 3216958 B1 20180502; HU E036727 T2 20180730
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 08101638 A 20080214; DE 202008018015 U 20080214; DE 202008018448 U 20080214; EP 17167772 A 20080214; HU E08101638 A 20080214