Global Patent Index - EP 1964949 A1

EP 1964949 A1 20080903 - Monofilament string

Title (en)

Monofilament string

Title (de)

Monofilamente Saite

Title (fr)

Cordage monofilamentaire

Publication

EP 1964949 A1 20080903 (EN)

Application

EP 07103157 A 20070227

Priority

EP 07103157 A 20070227

Abstract (en)

This invention relates to a monofilament string for use in tennis rackets and so on, which string comprises at least two phases, a first phase comprising a core containing an amount of a first polymer and a second phase comprising a matrix enclosing the core, in which the second phase contains an amount of a second polymer. The core and/or the matrix contains an amount of respectively at least a third and/or fourth polymer that can be the same or different. The first and second polymer can be the same or different, in which the first and third polymer are different and the second and fourth polymer are different.

IPC 8 full level

D01F 8/04 (2006.01); D01F 8/06 (2006.01); D01F 8/12 (2006.01); D01F 8/14 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

A63B 51/02 (2013.01); D01F 8/04 (2013.01); D01F 8/06 (2013.01); D01F 8/10 (2013.01); D01F 8/12 (2013.01); D01F 8/14 (2013.01); D01F 8/16 (2013.01); D02G 3/444 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 4382358 A 19830510 - TAPPE GUENTHER [DE], et al
  • [Y] EP 1054085 A1 20001122 - SHIMADZU CORP [JP], et al
  • [Y] DE 19931860 A1 20010111 - MONOFIL TECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al
  • [DA] US 2005160714 A1 20050728 - DELVAEL YVES [BE]
  • [A] US 6460321 B1 20021008 - KOSHIMAE TATSUMI [JP], et al
  • [A] US 4860531 A 19890829 - WELLS D PHILLIPS [US], et al
  • [XY] DATABASE CA [online] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US; 1 October 1994 (1994-10-01), YAMAMOTO, YUKIHISA: "Sheath-core polyester monofilaments", XP002466974, retrieved from STN Database accession no. 1994:559316 & JP H06128814 A 19940510 - SAN LINE KK
  • [Y] DATABASE CA [online] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US; 6 November 2004 (2004-11-06), HARA, TETSUYA ET AL: "Core-sheath polyamide conjugate monofilaments with high tensile strength and low heat shrinkage, comprising semiaromatic polyamides as the core and aliphatic polyamides and/or or semiaromatic polyamides as the sheath", XP002467070, retrieved from STN Database accession no. 2004:931768 & JP 2004308020 A 20041104 - KURARAY CO
  • [Y] DATABASE CA [online] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US; 5 March 2004 (2004-03-05), AMANO, KIYOSHI ET AL: "Polyester-type composite monofilaments and racket guts using them with excellent tensile strength, elastic recovery, ball controlling properties, and durability", XP002467071, retrieved from STN Database accession no. 2004:180260 & JP 2004068217 A 20040304 - TORAY MONOFILAMENT CO

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

DOCDB simple family (publication)

EP 1964949 A1 20080903

DOCDB simple family (application)

EP 07103157 A 20070227