Global Patent Index - EP 1968044 A3

EP 1968044 A3 2013-09-04 - System for audiovisual signals based on controlled identification data

Title (en)

System for audiovisual signals based on controlled identification data

Title (de)

System für audiovisuelle Signale basierend auf kontrollierten Identifikationsdaten

Title (fr)

Système de signaux audiovisuels basés sur des données d'identification contrôlée

Publication

EP 1968044 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 08425067 A

Priority

IT RM20070094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1968044A2] System to mark audio visual signals using controlled identification data, and implemented by a coder and a decoder using a PC, able to perform an electronic processing of audio frequency signals to code and to decode text messages in the audio playing of speech and musical files. The system is based on a SW program specifically developed. This system is a typical electronic product and properly an audiovisual electronic device utilised in the multimedia electronic devices.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/00 (2013.01); G10L 19/018 (2013.01); G11B 20/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 2006156003 A1 20060713 - ZHANG JUNBIAO [US], et al
  • [A] WO 9917537 A1 19990408 - HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US], et al
  • [A] US 2002191809 A1 20021219 - KIROVSKI DARKO [US], et al
  • [I] BENDER W ET AL: "TECHNIQUES FOR DATA HIDING", IBM SYSTEMS JOURNAL, IBM CORP. ARMONK, NEW YORK, US, vol. 35, no. 3/04, 1 January 1996 (1996-01-01), pages 313 - 335, XP000635079, ISSN: 0018-8670
  • [A] DARKO KIROVSKI ET AL: "Spread-Spectrum Watermarking of Audio Signals", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 51, no. 4, 1 April 2003 (2003-04-01), XP011080401, ISSN: 1053-587X

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1968044 A2 20080910; EP 1968044 A3 20130904; IT RM20070094 A1 20080821

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2013-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G10L 19/00 20130101AFI20130729BHEP

2013-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G11B 20/00 20060101ALI20130729BHEP

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARASCO, ANDREA

2008-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-09-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS