Global Patent Index - EP 1968159 B1

EP 1968159 B1 2017-10-18 - Circularly polarized patch antenna assembly

Title (en)

Circularly polarized patch antenna assembly

Title (de)

Zirkular polarisierte Patchantennenanordnung

Title (fr)

Ensemble d'antenne à plaque à polarisation circulaire

Publication

EP 1968159 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 07004583 A

Priority

EP 07004583 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1968159A1] A circularly polarized patch antenna assembly having a relatively compact volume includes a substrate, a radiation metal piece, a grounded metal piece and a signal-inputting body. A plurality of metal pieces in a form of elongate stripe extends from four sides of the grounded metal piece, thereby to reduce the resonant frequency. The metal pieces are adhered on the side face of the substrate, so that the metal piece on one side face is arranged diagonally with respect to the metal piece on the opposite side face. When the resonant frequency of the antenna is to be reduced, the position and the area of the metal piece can be adjusted but the increased area of the metal piece cannot be larger than a half area of the side face of the substrate. Alternatively, the length of the metal piece can be increased.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/0428 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0442 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1968159 A1 20080910; EP 1968159 B1 20171018

INPADOC legal status


2018-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171018

2018-02-21 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20171018

2017-11-30 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007052710

2017-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2017-10-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-07-19 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170620

2009-05-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2008-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071218

2008-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR