Global Patent Index - EP 1968690 A4

EP 1968690 A4 2009-02-18 - HELICAL ELECTRODES FOR INTRAMYOCARDIAL PACING AND SENSING

Title (en)

HELICAL ELECTRODES FOR INTRAMYOCARDIAL PACING AND SENSING

Title (de)

SPIRALFÖRMIGE ELEKTRODEN FÜR INTRAMYOKARDIALES PACING UND SENSING

Title (fr)

ELECTRODES HELICOIDALES POUR UNE STIMULATION ELECTRIQUE ET UNE DÉTECTION INTRAMYOCARDIQUES

Publication

EP 1968690 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 06817078 A

Priority

  • US 2006040613 W
  • US 75309805 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007073435A1] The invention provides for an electrical lead , s steerable sheath and a steerable catheter, a sheath and a catheter that attach to cardiac tissue via an anchor screw (38), and a method of pacing, particularly via the atrioventricular septum.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/0573 (2013.01); A61N 1/056 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007073435 A1 20070628; EP 1968690 A1 20080917; EP 1968690 A4 20090218

INPADOC legal status


2015-09-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150317

2014-12-03 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20141105

2014-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61N 1/05 20060101AFI20140930BHEP

2012-08-01 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090424

2009-02-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090115

2008-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR