Global Patent Index - EP 1969480 A4

EP 1969480 A4 20081203 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RELIABLE AND EFFICIENT CONTENT-BASED ROUTING AND QUERY AND RESPONSE IN A PUBLISH-SUBSCRIBE NETWORK

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RELIABLE AND EFFICIENT CONTENT-BASED ROUTING AND QUERY AND RESPONSE IN A PUBLISH-SUBSCRIBE NETWORK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZUVERLÄSSIGEN UND EFFIZIENTEN ROUTING AUF INHALTSBASIS UND ABFRAGEN UND ANTWORTEN IN EINEM PUBLISH-SUBSCRIBE-NETZWERK

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT L'ACHEMINEMENT BASE SUR LE CONTENU, FIABLE ET EFFICACE, ET L'INTERROGATION-REPONSE DANS UN RESEAU DE PUBLICATION-ABONNEMENT

Publication

EP 1969480 A4 20081203 (EN)

Application

EP 03714457 A 20030328

Priority

  • US 0309624 W 20030328
  • US 36910502 P 20020328
  • US 36883102 P 20020328
  • US 36887002 P 20020328
  • US 36883302 P 20020328
  • US 36983202 P 20020403
  • US 44778203 P 20030219

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03083703A1] A method and apparatus provide for executing publish-subscribe operations over unreliable networks (10). A method and apparatus provide for propagating filters in a publish-subscribe network (118, 140). A method and apparatus provide for content-based routing of packets in a publish-subscribe network (118, 140). A method and apparatus provide for implementing query-response interactions on a publish-subscribe network (118, 140). A method and apparatus provide for persistent caching of methods delivered via a publish-subscribe network (118, 140).

IPC 8 full level

G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/00 (2006.01); H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01); H04M 7/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP KR)

G06F 17/00 (2013.01 - KR); H04L 12/28 (2013.01 - KR); H04L 67/306 (2013.01 - EP); H04L 67/5651 (2022.05 - EP); H04L 67/566 (2022.05 - EP); H04L 67/568 (2022.05 - EP); H04L 67/63 (2022.05 - EP); H04L 67/561 (2022.05 - EP); H04L 69/329 (2013.01 - EP)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] GERO MÜHL: ""Generic Constraints for Content-Based Publish/Subscribe"", PROC. OF THE 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COOPERATIVE INFORMATION SYSTEMS (COOPIS'01), 5 September 2001 (2001-09-05) - 7 September 2001 (2001-09-07), pages 211 - 225, XP002500569, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.kbs.cs.tu-berlin.de/publications/fulltext/coopis2001.pdf> [retrieved on 20081020]
  • [X] LUKASZ OPYRCHAL, MARK ASTLEY , JOSHUA AUERBACH, GURUDUTH BANAVAR, ROBERT STROM, DANIEL STURMAN: "Exploiting IP Multicast in Content-Based Publish-Subscribe Systems", PROC. OF THE IFIP/ACM INTL CONFERENCE ON DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS PLATFORMS AND OPEN DISTRIBUED PROCESSING (MIDDLEWARE), LNCS VOL. 1795, 4 April 2000 (2000-04-04) - 8 April 2000 (2000-04-08), pages 185 - 207, XP002500570, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.cs.unibo.it/~panzieri/SisMid/Opyrchal.pdf> [retrieved on 20081017]
  • See also references of WO 03083703A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 03083703 A1 20031009; AU 2003218455 A1 20031013; CN 100458767 C 20090204; CN 1656474 A 20050817; EP 1969480 A1 20080917; EP 1969480 A4 20081203; JP 2005521950 A 20050721; JP 2009163753 A 20090723; KR 100971506 B1 20100721; KR 20040102061 A 20041203

DOCDB simple family (application)

US 0309624 W 20030328; AU 2003218455 A 20030328; CN 03812180 A 20030328; EP 03714457 A 20030328; JP 2003581058 A 20030328; JP 2009031766 A 20090213; KR 20047015458 A 20030328