Global Patent Index - EP 1970143 A3

EP 1970143 A3 2009-02-25 - Method for manufacturing of die cast pieces and die casting unit

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing of die cast pieces and die casting unit

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Druckgiessteilen und Giesseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de pièces coulées sous pression et unité de coulée sous pression

Publication

EP 1970143 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 08102163 A

Priority

DE 102007013200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1970143A2] Production of die-cast components, especially complex, heavy duty components, comprises feeding metal, especially an aluminum-containing material, as a melt in portions to the die-casting machine. The melt has a fine-grained structure and is fed to the gate (19) at 610 - 650[deg] C and more than 50 m/s : An independent claim is included for a die-casting machine for carrying out the method with a mold comprising fixed (13), movable (15) and floating (16) mold frame sections and a slide (14) mounted in guides.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1970143 A2 20080917; EP 1970143 A3 20090225; DE 102007013200 A1 20080918

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100707

2010-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100224

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2008-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS