EP 1970892 A1 20080917 - Method of establishing a harmony control signal controlled in real-time by a guitar input signal
Title (en)
Method of establishing a harmony control signal controlled in real-time by a guitar input signal
Title (de)
Verfahren zur Herstellung eines von einem Gitarreneingangssignal in Echtzeit gesteuerten Harmoniesteuersignals
Title (fr)
Procédé pour établir un signal de contrôle d'harmonie contrôlé en temps réel par un signal d'entrée de guitare
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 07005051 A 20070312
Abstract (en)
The invention relates to a method of establishing a harmony control signal controlled in real-time by a guitar audio input signal (GAS), comprising the steps of - providing a first input harmony input control signal (FIH) on the basis of said guitar audio input signal (GAS), - providing a second input harmony control signal (SIH) on the basis of a voice audio input signal (VAS). - providing an input audio extraction representation (IAER) on the basis of said first input harmony input control signal (FIH), - establishing a harmony control signal (HCS) on the basis of said input audio extraction representation (IAER) and said second input harmony control signal (SIH).
IPC 8 full level
G10H 1/38 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G10H 1/38 (2013.01); G10H 3/125 (2013.01); G10H 5/005 (2013.01); G10H 2210/066 (2013.01); G10H 2210/251 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 6124544 A 20000926 - ALEXANDER JOHN STERN [US], et al
- [A] EP 0282458 A2 19880914 - KETRON SRL [IT]
- [A] EP 0729130 A2 19960828 - YAMAHA CORP [JP]
- [X] DIGITECH: "Vocalist Live 2", WEBSITE, 20 February 2007 (2007-02-20), Internet, XP002445565, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://web.archive.org/web/20070220102230/http://www.digitech.com/products/Vocalist_Live2/>
- [X] DIGITECH: "Vocalist Live 2, Vocal Harmony and Effects Processor", OWNER'S MANUAL, February 2007 (2007-02-01), INTERNET, XP002445566
- [A] VAIL M: "DIGITECH VHM 5 VOCALIST. ÖVOCAL HARMONY PROCESSOR", KEYBOARD, MUSIC PLAYER NETWORK, SAN FRANSISCO, CA, US, vol. 18, no. 11, 1 November 1992 (1992-11-01), pages 146 - 150, XP000307521, ISSN: 0730-0158
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL BA HR MK RS
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 07005051 A 20070312