Global Patent Index - EP 1971696 A4

EP 1971696 A4 2013-09-04 - METHOD FOR THE PRECIPITATION OF NICKEL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE PRECIPITATION OF NICKEL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR FÄLLUNG VON NICKEL

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉCIPITATION DE NICKEL

Publication

EP 1971696 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 07701358 A

Priority

  • AU 2007000013 W
  • AU 2006900103 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007079531A1] A method (10) for the recovery of nickel and cobalt from leach solutions in the presence of iron and/or chrome, the method comprising the steps of: i) adding a reductant (13) to a leach solution containing nickel, cobalt and iron, such that any iron present as ferric sulphate is reduced to ferrous sulphate and/or any hexavalent chrome is reduced to trivalent chrome; ii) neutralising (14) at least a portion of the free acid through addition of a neutralising agent; iii) further addition of the reducing agent (15) to ensure all iron present remains in the ferrous form and/or any chrome remains in the trivalent form; iv) heating the solution prior to mixed sulphide precipitation; v) adding a mixed sulphide seed (21) and hydrogen sulphide (22) to effect precipitation (20) of the nickel and cobalt in the form of a mixed sulphide product (24); and vi) maintaining this mixture in the presence of hydrogen sulphide (22) for the required residence time to effect complete precipitation of the mixed sulphide product (24).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22B 3/20 (2006.01); C22B 3/44 (2006.01); C22B 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22B 3/44 (2013.01); C22B 15/0093 (2013.01); C22B 23/0461 (2013.01); C22B 23/0469 (2013.01); Y02P 10/234 (2015.11); Y02P 10/236 (2015.11)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL MK

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007079531 A1 20070719; AU 2007204590 A1 20070719; AU 2007204590 B2 20100722; BR PI0706851 A2 20110412; CA 2636378 A1 20070719; EP 1971696 A1 20080924; EP 1971696 A4 20130904; RU 2008126770 A 20100220; ZA 200805618 B 20090826

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140304

2013-09-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130806

2013-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C22B 3/20 20060101AFI20130731BHEP

2013-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C22B 3/44 20060101ALI20130731BHEP

2013-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C22B 23/00 20060101ALI20130731BHEP

2012-08-01 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20080630

- Countries: MK

2012-08-01 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20080710

- Countries: AL

2012-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MURRIN MURRIN OPERATIONS PTY LTD

2008-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-09-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL MK