Global Patent Index - EP 1975117 A9

EP 1975117 A9 2009-02-25 - FILLING HEAD WITH LOW REYNOLDS NUMBER

Title (en)

FILLING HEAD WITH LOW REYNOLDS NUMBER

Title (de)

FÜLLKOPF MIT NIEDRIGER REYNOLDSSCHER ZAHL

Title (fr)

TÊTE DE REMPLISSAGE À FAIBLE NOMBRE DE REYNOLDS

Publication

EP 1975117 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 06841692 A

Priority

  • ES 2006000622 W
  • ES 200600130 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1975117A1] The invention relates to a filling head with low Reynolds number, consisting of an inner body (2) and an outer body (3), in which one moves axially with respect to the other, there being a space (4) delimited between them that configures the dynamic characteristics that the flow will have, comprising a damping zone A with inlet (5) located on a different axis from that of the outlet (6), a pressure-loss zone B with seated valve (7), a zone C, with low Reynolds number, composed of n channels (10), with n fins (9) greater than 3 and LRHC less than 4, an ogival acceleration zone D and a nozzle (8) or closure zone E with a seal (13).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/281 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1975117 A1 20081001; EP 1975117 A4 20130522; EP 1975117 A9 20090225; CA 2637738 A1 20070726; CA 2637738 C 20140902; ES 2307366 A1 20081116; ES 2307366 B1 20090918; US 2009301605 A1 20091210; US 8312902 B2 20121120; WO 2007082966 A1 20070726

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140423

2014-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20131211

2013-05-22 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130422

2013-05-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B67C 3/28 20060101AFI20130416BHEP

2012-08-01 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR