EP 1976167 A4 20140625 - TRANSMISSION DEVICE, RECEPTION DEVICE, AND COMMUNICATION METHOD
Title (en)
TRANSMISSION DEVICE, RECEPTION DEVICE, AND COMMUNICATION METHOD
Title (de)
SENDEEINRICHTUNG, EMPFANGSEINRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN
Title (fr)
DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION, DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION ET MÉTHODE DE COMMUNICATION
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 2007050210 W 20070111
- JP 2006010499 A 20060118
- JP 2006031743 A 20060208
- JP 2006127991 A 20060501
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1976167A1] A disclosed transmitter includes a system information generation unit generating system information; a multiplexing unit multiplexing a system information item in the system information required for cell search into a broadcast channel and multiplexing a system information item in the system information other than the system information item required for cell search into a channel different from the broadcast channel; and a transmission unit transmitting the broadcast channel and the channel different from the broadcast channel.
IPC 8 full level
H04J 11/00 (2006.01); H04B 1/707 (2011.01); H04B 1/7083 (2011.01); H04L 5/00 (2006.01); H04L 27/26 (2006.01); H04W 4/06 (2009.01); H04W 48/08 (2009.01); H04W 64/00 (2009.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
H04B 1/7083 (2013.01 - EP KR US); H04B 7/02 (2013.01 - KR); H04J 11/0069 (2013.01 - EP US); H04L 5/0026 (2013.01 - EP US); H04L 27/2601 (2013.01 - EP US); H04W 4/06 (2013.01 - EP US); H04W 48/08 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [XI] US 2005030886 A1 20050210 - WU SHIQUAN [CA], et al
- [XI] HAARDT M ET AL: "The TD-CDMA based UTRA TDD mode", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, vol. 18, no. 8, 1 August 2000 (2000-08-01), pages 1375 - 1385, XP011450053, ISSN: 0733-8716, DOI: 10.1109/49.864003
- [XI] ZENG M ET AL: "Harmonization of Global Third-Generation Mobile Systems", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, vol. 38, no. 12, 1 December 2000 (2000-12-01), pages 94 - 104, XP011091396, ISSN: 0163-6804
- See references of WO 2007083555A1
Citation (examination)
- QUALCOMM EUROPE: "DL PHY channels: Overall structure", vol. RAN WG1, no. HELSINKI, FINLAND; 20060123 - 20060125, 19 January 2006 (2006-01-19), XP050951000, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/LTE_AH_0601/Docs/> [retrieved on 20060119]
- CATT ET AL: "Cell Search procedure of EUTRA TDD system for the initial synchronization", vol. RAN WG1, no. HELSINKI, FINLAND; 20060123 - 20060125, 18 January 2006 (2006-01-18), XP050950847, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/LTE_AH_0601/Docs/> [retrieved on 20060118]
- NTT DOCOMO: "Physical Channel Concept for Scalable Bandwidth in Evolved UTRA Downlink", vol. RAN WG1, no. SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS, FRANCE; 20050620 - 20050621, 16 June 2005 (2005-06-16), XP050950726, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/LTE_AH_0506/Docs/> [retrieved on 20050616]
- TEXAS INSTRUMENTS: "Downlink Synchronization Channel Schemes for E-UTRA", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-051057_CELL SEARCH, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, vol. RAN WG1, no. San Diego, USA; 20051004, 4 October 2005 (2005-10-04), XP050100674
- NTT DOCOMO: "Physical Channels and Multiplexing in Evolved UTRA Downlink", vol. RAN WG1, no. Sophia Antipolis, France; 20050620 - 20050621, 16 June 2005 (2005-06-16), XP050950724, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/LTE_AH_0506/Docs/> [retrieved on 20050616]
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1976167 A1 20081001; EP 1976167 A4 20140625; BR PI0706634 A2 20110405; CN 101395830 A 20090325; CN 101395830 B 20120530; JP 2007243899 A 20070920; JP 4869778 B2 20120208; KR 101307980 B1 20130913; KR 20080092963 A 20081016; TW 200737796 A 20071001; TW I334285 B 20101201; US 2010128805 A1 20100527; WO 2007083555 A1 20070726
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 07706557 A 20070111; BR PI0706634 A 20070111; CN 200780008003 A 20070111; JP 2006127991 A 20060501; JP 2007050210 W 20070111; KR 20087020030 A 20070111; TW 96101580 A 20070116; US 16134107 A 20070111