Global Patent Index - EP 1988046 A8

EP 1988046 A8 2009-02-11 - CONTROL SYSTEM FOR ELEVATOR

Title (en)

CONTROL SYSTEM FOR ELEVATOR

Title (de)

STEUERSYSTEM FÜR AUFZUG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMMANDE D'ASCENSEUR

Publication

EP 1988046 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 06714181 A

Priority

JP 2006303041 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1988046A1] A control system for elevators is provided with a landing call registration device provided at each of landing floors so as to be operable thereat, a landing call automatic registration portion for setting that one of the landing floors at which the landing call registration device is operated as a car call floor and registering a car call to stop one of cars at the car call floor, a response selection portion for selecting that one of elevator apparatuses which responds to a registered car call as a selected elevator, a passenger traveling time period calculation portion for setting that one of elevator doorways of the selected elevator which is provided at the car call floor as a selected doorway and calculating a passenger traveling time period corresponding to the selected doorway, and an opening/closing control portion for controlling the opening/closing operation of the selected doorway based on information from the selected elevator and information from the passenger traveling time period calculation portion. When the selected doorway is already in a door-open state at the time of registration of the car call, the opening/closing control portion continues to hold the selected doorway in the door-open state until the passenger traveling time period elapses after registration of the car call.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/18 (2006.01); B66B 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/2458 (2013.01); B66B 2201/103 (2013.01); B66B 2201/211 (2013.01); B66B 2201/232 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1988046 A1 20081105; EP 1988046 A4 20130109; EP 1988046 A8 20090211; CN 101291864 A 20081022; CN 101291864 B 20130821; JP WO2007096947 A1 20090709; KR 100973882 B1 20100803; KR 20080055885 A 20080619; US 2009178890 A1 20090716; US 7918321 B2 20110405; WO 2007096947 A1 20070830

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-18 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180321

2018-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 1/24 20060101AFI20171130BHEP

2013-01-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20121207

2013-01-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 1/24 20060101AFI20121203BHEP

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-03-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2009-02-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION

2008-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE NL