Global Patent Index - EP 1988048 A8

EP 1988048 A8 2009-02-11 - EVACUATION ASSISTANCE DEVICE FOR ELEVATOR

Title (en)

EVACUATION ASSISTANCE DEVICE FOR ELEVATOR

Title (de)

EVAKUIERUNGSUNTERSTÜTZUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR AUFZUG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'AIDE A L'EVACUATION POUR ASCENSEUR

Publication

EP 1988048 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 06714429 A

Priority

JP 2006303289 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1988048A1] A building is provided with an elevator and evacuation stairs. Each floor is separated into an elevator region in which the elevator is provided and a stair region in which the evacuation stairs are provided. In an event of a fire in the building, an evacuation assistance device for the elevator sets a predetermined service floor as a rescue floor, and supervises an operation of the elevator so as to convey those stranded in the building from the rescue floor to an evacuation floor. A rescue floor crowdedness detecting device detects crowdedness or uncrowdedness of the elevator region at the rescue floor. An evacuation guidance device for reporting to those stranded in the building accessibility information representing the accessibility of those stranded in the building to the elevator region at the rescue floor from the stair region is installed in the building. Information from the rescue floor crowdedness detecting device is transmitted to an emergency control device. The emergency control device has an evacuation operation performability determining portion for determining whether or not those stranded in the building can be conveyed from the rescue floor to the evacuation floor, and an evacuation guidance device control portion for controlling the evacuation guidance device based on information from the evacuation operation performability determining portion and the information from the rescue floor crowdedness detecting device.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/021 (2013.01); B66B 5/024 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1988048 A1 20081105; EP 1988048 A4 20130612; EP 1988048 A8 20090211; EP 1988048 B1 20140702; CN 101300186 A 20081105; CN 101300186 B 20110518; JP 4926940 B2 20120509; JP WO2007096969 A1 20090709; KR 100989268 B1 20101020; KR 20080056251 A 20080620; US 2009038891 A1 20090212; US 7677363 B2 20100316; WO 2007096969 A1 20070830

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180214

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-05-05 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 602006042121

2015-06-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20150407

2015-04-07 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602006042121

2014-08-21 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602006042121

- Effective date: 20140821

2014-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2014-03-05 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140205

2013-06-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130513

2013-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 5/02 20060101AFI20130506BHEP

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-03-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE

2008-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION

2008-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE