Global Patent Index - EP 1988052 A8

EP 1988052 A8 2009-02-11 - MOVING HANDRAIL REPAIR DEVICE FOR PASSENGER CONVEYOR

Title (en)

MOVING HANDRAIL REPAIR DEVICE FOR PASSENGER CONVEYOR

Title (de)

REPARATURVORRICHTUNG FÜR BEWEGLICHEN HANDLAUF FÜR PERSONENBEFÖRDERUNGSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REPARATION DE MAIN COURANTE POUR SYSTEME DE TRANSPORT DE PASSAGERS

Publication

EP 1988052 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 06714182 A

Priority

JP 2006303042 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1988052A1] A moving handrail repair device includes a self-travelling means and a heating means mounted on the self-travelling means. The self-travelling means travels on a balustrade of a passenger conveyor along a longitudinal direction of a moving handrail. The heatingmeans heats and melts a surface portion of the moving handrail. The surface portion of the moving handrail is formed of a thermoplastic material. In a case where the surface portion of the moving handrail is damaged, an object portion to be repaired of the surface portion is heated and melted, and then the object portion is re-hardened.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 31/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/24 (2013.01); B29C 73/00 (2013.01); B29C 73/30 (2013.01); B29C 73/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1988052 A1 20081105; EP 1988052 A4 20150909; EP 1988052 A8 20090211; JP 5052901 B2 20121017; JP WO2007096948 A1 20090709; KR 100931431 B1 20091211; KR 20070092957 A 20070914; US 2009136605 A1 20090528; WO 2007096948 A1 20070830

INPADOC legal status


2016-09-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160308

2015-09-09 [RA4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20150811

2015-09-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 31/02 20060101AFI20150805BHEP

2015-09-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 23/24 20060101ALI20150805BHEP

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2010-04-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2008-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION

2008-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070904

2008-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE NL