Global Patent Index - EP 1992417 A3

EP 1992417 A3 2009-02-18 - Removal and capture device for excess material from coating mechanisms

Title (en)

Removal and capture device for excess material from coating mechanisms

Title (de)

Abführ- und Auffangvorrichtung für Überschußmaterial von Auftragswerken

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'évacuation et de réception pour matériau excessif d'unités d'application

Publication

EP 1992417 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 08007564 A

Priority

DE 202007007040 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1992417A2] The device has a collecting device (5) for collecting overflowing surplus material underneath a roller (1) of a coating head. A chamfer (6) is arranged at axial ends of the roller, and runs in a peripheral direction. The chamfer receives the overflowing surplus material and discharges the received material to the collecting device, where the chamfer includes a U-shaped kin cross section. The chamfer is formed in an interior element that is attached to a front side of the roller. A feeding device (2) projects laterally over the axial ends of the roller.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 1/0817 (2013.01); B05C 1/083 (2013.01); B05C 11/1039 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202007007040 U1 20070816; EP 1992417 A2 20081119; EP 1992417 A3 20090218

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090819

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2008-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS