Global Patent Index - EP 1992586 A3

EP 1992586 A3 2009-02-25 - Mechanism for adjusting distance between first and second support members

Title (en)

Mechanism for adjusting distance between first and second support members

Title (de)

Mechanismus zur Abstandsangleichung zwischen dem ersten und zweiten Stützträger

Title (fr)

Mécanisme pour régler la distance entre le premier et le deuxième élément de support

Publication

EP 1992586 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 07101730 A

Priority

DK PA200600154 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1992586A2] A mechanism for adjusting distance between a first and a second support member (7, 8), preferably an elevating mechanism for an elevating table, and of the type with two-part legs (3) in pairs, each including a first upper arm (5) and a first lower arm (6) that each are connected with a support part (7 and 8, respectively) at one end and which are mutually connected by a first articulated joint (10) at their second ends. The two legs are mutually connected with a spindle (12) connected by threaded bushings (11) associated with each of the first articulated joints, producing a reduction of the angle between the first upper arm and the first lower arm by rotation of the spindle in one direction and increase of the angle by rotation of the spindle in the other direction, in order thereby to reduce or to increase the distance between the support members. A second upper arm (13) and a second lower arm (14) are provided for each leg (3), the second arms being connected at their first ends with the first upper arm and the first lower arm, respectively, at a position between the outer ends thereof, and which at the second ends are interconnected by a second articulated joint (21) which is provided farther from each other than the first articulated joints, and that a bearing (22) for the spindle is provided at the second articulated joint. The design provides a stable support, while at the same time being production- and mounting-friendly.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 7/0633 (2013.01); B66F 7/0608 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1992586 A2 20081119; EP 1992586 A3 20090225; DK 200600154 A 20070805

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110514

2009-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090824

2009-11-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091006

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2008-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS