Global Patent Index - EP 1998124 B1

EP 1998124 B1 2017-10-04 - AIR CONDITIONER

Title (en)

AIR CONDITIONER

Title (de)

KLIMAANLAGE

Title (fr)

CLIMATISEUR

Publication

EP 1998124 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 07738077 A

Priority

  • JP 2007054587 W
  • JP 2006065932 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1998124A1] An object of the present invention is to control a high pressure gas pipe so as to reduce the pressure to a low level in order to prevent accumulation of liquid refrigerant in the high pressure gas pipe resulting from condensation. An air conditioner (1) is an air conditioner that performs a refrigerant quantity judging operation to judge the refrigerant quantity in a refrigerant circuit (10), and includes a heat source unit (2) , utilization units (3a to 3c), expansion mechanisms (V2, V9a to V9c), a first refrigerant gas pipe (52), a second refrigerant gas pipe (53), a refrigerant liquid pipe (51), switching mechanisms (4a to 4c), bypass circuits (27, 43a to 43c), bypass circuit opening/closing means (V3, V13a to V13c), and a controller (8). The switching mechanism can switch between a first state and a second state. The bypass circuit opening/closing means are provided in the bypass circuits that bypass the first refrigerant gas pipe to the second refrigerant gas pipe, and open and close the bypass circuits. The controller opens the bypass circuit opening/closing means before performing the refrigerant quantity judging operation.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 49/02 (2006.01); F25B 13/00 (2006.01); F25B 49/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 13/00 (2013.01); F25B 49/005 (2013.01); F25B 2313/02741 (2013.01); F25B 2400/04 (2013.01); F25B 2400/13 (2013.01); F25B 2500/19 (2013.01); F25B 2600/21 (2013.01); F25B 2700/04 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1998124 A1 20081203; EP 1998124 A4 20161102; EP 1998124 B1 20171004; AU 2007225803 A1 20070920; AU 2007225803 B2 20091224; CN 101395436 A 20090325; CN 101395436 B 20120829; JP 2007240108 A 20070920; JP 3963192 B1 20070822; KR 100960539 B1 20100603; KR 20080097475 A 20081105; US 2009031739 A1 20090205; WO 2007105604 A1 20070920

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007052567

2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2017-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 934437 T

- Effective date: 20171015

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YOSHIMI, MANABU

2017-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NISHIMURA, TADAFUMI

2017-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KASAHARA, SHINICHI

2017-07-05 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170609

2017-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25B 49/00 20060101ALI20170510BHEP

2017-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25B 49/02 20060101AFI20170510BHEP

2017-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25B 13/00 20060101ALI20170510BHEP

2016-11-02 [RA4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20161004

2016-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25B 49/02 20060101AFI20160927BHEP

2016-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25B 13/00 20060101ALI20160927BHEP

2016-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25B 49/00 20060101ALI20160927BHEP

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080926

2008-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR