Global Patent Index - EP 2000419 A3

EP 2000419 A3 2009-02-18 - Bag for holding groceries containing a perforated seam

Title (en)

Bag for holding groceries containing a perforated seam

Title (de)

Beutel zur Aufnahme von Lebensmitteln, enthaltend eine Perforationsnaht

Title (fr)

Sac destiné à la réception d'aliments, comprenant une couture de perforation

Publication

EP 2000419 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 08010253 A

Priority

DE 102007026807 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2000419A2] Bag (1) comprises a first perforation seam on the front side (2), a second perforation seam on the rear side (12) extending from the front and rear side on the opening side up to the front and rear side on the base side, a third perforation on the front side, a fourth perforation spaced from the first side edge (8) of the front and rear side up to a second side edge (10), a fifth perforation on the front side, a sixth perforation extending from the front and rear side to the first and second side edges and a seventh perforation on the front side and extending from the first or second side edge. Preferred Features: The perforation seams on the front and rear sides have an average distance of not more than 15 mm.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/5805 (2013.01); A47G 21/001 (2013.01); B65D 85/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2000419 A2 20081210; EP 2000419 A3 20090218; AT 13550 U1 20140315; DE 102007026807 A1 20081211; DE 102007026807 B4 20110324; DK 201200180 U1 20130111; DK 201200180 U3 20130125; DK 2535295 T3 20141208; EP 2535295 A1 20121219; EP 2535295 B1 20140827; ES 2523820 T3 20141201

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-06 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20141023

2012-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PAPIER-METTLER INHABER MICHAEL METTLER E.K.

2010-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100616

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090813

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2008-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-12-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS