Global Patent Index - EP 2000737 A8

EP 2000737 A8 2009-02-25 - Module adapter for portable light sources

Title (en)

Module adapter for portable light sources

Title (de)

Moduladapter für tragbare Lichtquellen

Title (fr)

Adaptateur de module pour sources lumineuses portables

Publication

EP 2000737 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 08157008 A

Priority

US 80746507 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2008030977A1] An adapter for a portable light source permits a module to be attached to the portable light source and powered by the power source of the portable light source. In one embodiment of the invention, the power source is a battery and the adapter includes a bottom plate and a housing defining a compartment that holds the module. In this embodiment, the bottom plate of the adapter features a positive contact opening and a negative contact opening adapted to receive and electrically communicate with the positive and negative terminals of the battery. The bottom plate of the adapter also includes positive and negative contact leads which communicate with the contact openings and the module so that the latter receives power from the battery.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21L 4/00 (2006.01); F21V 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21L 4/02 (2013.01); F21V 33/00 (2013.01); F21L 4/08 (2013.01); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

US 2008030977 A1 20080207; US 7563001 B2 20090721; AU 2008202285 A1 20081218; AU 2008202285 B2 20130328; CA 2631244 A1 20081129; CA 2631244 C 20170711; CN 101315150 A 20081203; EP 2000737 A1 20081210; EP 2000737 A8 20090225; EP 2390554 A2 20111130; EP 2390554 A3 20170329; MX 2008006559 A 20090304; PE 01282009 A1 20090221

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170318

2013-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 33/00 20060101AFI20130513BHEP

2013-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21L 4/00 20060101ALI20130513BHEP

2009-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090729

2009-08-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090609

2008-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-12-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS