Global Patent Index - EP 2000806 A9

EP 2000806 A9 2009-02-11 - ANALYSIS DEVICE DATA MANAGING SYSTEM

Title (en)

ANALYSIS DEVICE DATA MANAGING SYSTEM

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUR DATENVERWALTUNG EINER ANALYSEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE GESTION DE DONNEES DE DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE

Publication

EP 2000806 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 06729758 A

Priority

JP 2006305791 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2000806A2] When an analysis is finished in the GC/MS 11, which is an analyzing apparatus, and a file including the data obtained by the analysis is created by the analysis data file creator 13, the file transfer processor 14 sends the file to the web server 2 by way of the intranet 4. The file transfer processor 22 converts the data received into a format capable of being posted on a web page and stores it in the memory 21, and simultaneously notifies the analysis unit 1 of a link address for reading it out. The e-mail creation processor 15 creates an e-mail with the link address in the body and sends it to a predetermined mail address. The user receives and opens the e-mail on the mailer 31 of the client terminal 3 and clicks a link address corresponding to the desired analysis data. In response to this operation, the web server 2 sends the corresponding data to the terminal 3, which allows the analysis data to be viewed by the web browser 32.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 35/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 35/00871 (2013.01); G01N 30/8651 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 2000806 A2 20081210; EP 2000806 A4 20140319; EP 2000806 A9 20090211; JP 4623209 B2 20110202; JP WO2007108120 A1 20090730; US 2009037549 A1 20090205; US 8260867 B2 20120904; WO 2007108120 A1 20070927

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20161110

2014-03-19 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20140217

2014-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 35/08 20060101AFI20140211BHEP

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KATSUYAMA, YUJI,C/O SHIMADZU CORPORATION

2008-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB