Global Patent Index - EP 2001255 A9

EP 2001255 A9 2009-02-25 - PORTABLE BASE STATION DEVICE

Title (en)

PORTABLE BASE STATION DEVICE

Title (de)

TRAGBARE BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE STATION DE BASE PORTATIVE

Publication

EP 2001255 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 07739423 A

Priority

  • JP 2007055982 W
  • JP 2006083653 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2001255A2] This invention provides a mobile base station device which allows tamper resistance to be adequately secured even when the housing is opened illicitly. In a mobile base station device 1, when a housing 2 is opened illicitly, a user ID or similar is transmitted to a service management server 20, and the user attempting an illicit operation is identified. By registering the identified user on a blacklist, subsequent use of the mobile base station device 1 by this user can be prohibited. Also, in the mobile base station device 1, together with transmission of the user ID, a communication control program 7 is deleted from a communication control module 6, so that the interior of the housing 2 is rendered a "black box", and modification and illicit use of the communication control program can be deterred. As a result, even when the housing 2 of the mobile base station device 1 is opened illicitly, tamper resistance can be adequately secured.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04W 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 21/20 (2006.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04M 3/00 (2006.01); H04W 88/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 88/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 2001255 A2 20081210; EP 2001255 A4 20100908; EP 2001255 A9 20090225; EP 2001255 B1 20170524; CN 101411221 A 20090415; CN 101411221 B 20120718; JP 2007259290 A 20071004; JP 4689511 B2 20110525; US 2009131019 A1 20090521; US 8107925 B2 20120131; WO 2007111239 A1 20071004

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20180227

2018-02-27 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007051110

2017-07-06 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007051110

2017-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2017-05-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-03-15 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170216

2017-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YAMADA, KAZUHIRO,

2017-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NATSUNO, TAKESHI,

2017-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KANO, IZUA,

2017-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 21/86 20130101ALI20170125BHEP

2017-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04W 88/08 20090101AFI20170125BHEP

2017-01-25 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 602007051110

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04W0004000000

- IPC: H04W0088080000

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-09-08 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100806

2009-04-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04W 4/00 20090101AFI20090112BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 21/20 20060101ALI20090112BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04B 7/26 20060101ALI20090112BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04M 3/00 20060101ALI20090112BHEP

2008-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081002

2008-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB