Global Patent Index - EP 2002898 A8

EP 2002898 A8 2009-02-25 - Application device for applying a fluid onto a substrate with valve devices, method for cleaning the application device and valve device for application device

Title (en)

Application device for applying a fluid onto a substrate with valve devices, method for cleaning the application device and valve device for application device

Title (de)

Auftragungseinrichtung zum Auftragen von Fluid auf ein Substrat mit Ventileinrichtungen, Verfahren zum Reinigen der Auftragungseinrichtung und Ventileinrichtung für die Auftragungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'application doté de buses, destiné à appliquer un liquide sur un substrat, procédé destiné à nettoyer le dispositif d'application et les buses du dispositif d'application.

Publication

EP 2002898 A8 (DE)

Application

EP 07090124 A

Priority

EP 07090124 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2002898A1] Application device comprises a cleaning valve arrangement (20) assigned to the fluid inlet channel (110) of a distribution fluid chamber with a cleaning valve nozzle (30) and a valve actuating unit (5) for closing and opening the cleaning valve nozzle. A flow path (100) for cleaning the fluid chamber is formed in the distribution fluid chamber between the fluid inlet channel and the cleaning valve arrangement when the cleaning valve nozzle is open. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) Method for cleaning the application device; and (2) Electronic control device for the application device. Preferred Features:.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/02 (2006.01); B05B 1/20 (2006.01); B05C 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/0279 (2013.01); B05B 1/3053 (2013.01); B05B 15/55 (2018.02); B05C 5/0225 (2013.01); B05B 1/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2002898 A1 20081217; EP 2002898 A8 20090225; AT 520473 T 20110915; CA 2690062 A1 20081218; CA 2690062 C 20150331; CA 2690108 A1 20081218; CN 101711186 A 20100519; CN 101711186 B 20130717; CN 101784348 A 20100721; EP 2162234 A2 20100317; EP 2162235 A1 20100317; EP 2162235 B1 20110817; IL 202426 A 20140630; IL 202426 D0 20100630; IL 202427 D0 20100630; JP 2010528852 A 20100826; JP 2010531213 A 20100924; JP 5228039 B2 20130703; KR 101398760 B1 20140627; KR 20100021651 A 20100225; KR 20100051786 A 20100518; US 2010132612 A1 20100603; US 2010170918 A1 20100708; US 7837071 B2 20101123; WO 2008151713 A2 20081218; WO 2008151713 A3 20090507; WO 2008151713 A8 20090312; WO 2008151714 A1 20081218

INPADOC legal status


2010-08-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100209

2009-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090727

2009-08-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090610

2008-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-12-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS