Global Patent Index - EP 2003187 A9

EP 2003187 A9 2009-02-11 - LUBRICANT COMPOSITION

Title (en)

LUBRICANT COMPOSITION

Title (de)

SCHMIERMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION LUBRIFIANTE

Publication

EP 2003187 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 07740012 A

Priority

  • JP 2007056574 W
  • JP 2006091243 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2003187A2] The lubricant composition of this invention comprises a base oil and an additive, which is at least one selected from the group consisting of an organic sulfonate, a carboxylate, a thiocarbamate and a thiophosphoric acid ester salt. The lubricant composition can effectively suppress hydrogen embrittlement-caused flaking of an element, such as a rolling bearing, a sliding bearing, a gear, a ball thread, a linear guide, a linear bearing, a cam and various joints in a high concentration hydrogen environment. The invention provides also a rolling bearing, a sliding bearing, a gear, a ball thread, a linear guide, a linear bearing, a cam and various joints using the lubricant composition.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 129/26 (2006.01); C10M 101/02 (2006.01); C10M 105/02 (2006.01); C10M 105/18 (2006.01); C10M 105/38 (2006.01); C10M 107/02 (2006.01); C10M 113/12 (2006.01); C10M 113/16 (2006.01); C10M 115/08 (2006.01); C10M 117/02 (2006.01); C10M 119/22 (2006.01); C10M 129/32 (2006.01); C10M 129/40 (2006.01); C10M 129/50 (2006.01); C10M 135/10 (2006.01); C10M 135/18 (2006.01); C10M 137/10 (2006.01); C10M 159/24 (2006.01); C10M 169/02 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01); F16C 33/10 (2006.01); F16C 33/66 (2006.01); C10N 10/02 (2006.01); C10N 10/04 (2006.01); C10N 10/08 (2006.01); C10N 10/10 (2006.01); C10N 10/12 (2006.01); C10N 10/16 (2006.01); C10N 30/00 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 40/02 (2006.01); C10N 40/04 (2006.01); C10N 50/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 135/10 (2013.01); C10M 135/18 (2013.01); C10M 137/10 (2013.01); C10M 159/24 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1006 (2013.01); C10M 2205/0285 (2013.01); C10M 2207/0406 (2013.01); C10M 2207/122 (2013.01); C10M 2207/126 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2215/1026 (2013.01); C10M 2219/044 (2013.01); C10M 2219/046 (2013.01); C10M 2219/066 (2013.01); C10M 2219/068 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10N 2230/02 (2013.01); C10N 2230/06 (2013.01); C10N 2230/12 (2013.01); C10N 2240/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/04 (2013.01); C10N 2250/10 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C10M 2207/122 + C10N 2210/08
  2. C10M 2207/122 + C10N 2210/06
  3. C10M 2207/122 + C10N 2210/05
  4. C10M 2207/126 + C10N 2210/05
  5. C10M 2207/126 + C10N 2210/08
  6. C10M 2207/126 + C10N 2210/06
  7. C10M 2219/044 + C10N 2210/01
  8. C10M 2219/044 + C10N 2210/02
  9. C10M 2219/046 + C10N 2210/02
  10. C10M 2219/066 + C10N 2210/05
  11. C10M 2219/066 + C10N 2210/02
  12. C10M 2219/066 + C10N 2210/04
  13. C10M 2219/066 + C10N 2210/06
  14. C10M 2219/066 + C10N 2210/08
  15. C10M 2219/066 + C10N 2210/01
  16. C10M 2219/068 + C10N 2210/02
  17. C10M 2219/068 + C10N 2210/04
  18. C10M 2219/068 + C10N 2210/08
  19. C10M 2219/068 + C10N 2210/06
  20. C10M 2219/068 + C10N 2210/05
  21. C10M 2223/045 + C10N 2210/02
  22. C10M 2223/045 + C10N 2210/06
  23. C10M 2223/045 + C10N 2210/05

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2003187 A2 20081217; EP 2003187 A4 20110126; EP 2003187 A9 20090211; EP 2003187 B1 20180131; CN 101432404 A 20090513; CN 101432404 B 20140108; JP 2007262300 A 20071011; KR 101173464 B1 20120814; KR 20080109015 A 20081216; US 2009016652 A1 20090115; US 2014303055 A1 20141009; US 9376644 B2 20160628; WO 2007114135 A1 20071011

INPADOC legal status


2018-03-08 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007053852

2018-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2018-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-01-10 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20171212

2017-12-06 [INTC] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT (DELETED)

2017-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ENDO, TOSHIAKI

2017-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: IMAI, YUTAKA

2017-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DONG, DA MING

2017-07-12 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170616

2012-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120522

2011-01-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20101227

2009-05-06 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2008-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR