Global Patent Index - EP 2003612 A9

EP 2003612 A9 2009-02-25 - IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD

Title (en)

IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD

Title (de)

BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE

Publication

EP 2003612 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 06810636 A

Priority

  • JP 2006319145 W
  • JP 2006096984 A
  • JP 2006096985 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2003612A2] An image processing method adopted to remove noise present in an image, includes: an image input step in which an original image constituted of apluralityof pixels is input; a multiple resolution image generation step in which a plurality of low-frequency images with resolutions decreasing in sequence and a plurality of high-frequency images with the resolutions decreasing in sequence are generated by decomposing the input original image; a noise removal processing step in which noise removal processing is individually executed on the low-frequency images and the high-frequency images ; and an image acquisition step in which a noise-free image of the original image is obtained based upon both the low-frequency images and the high-frequency images having undergone the noise removal processing.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 5/00 (2006.01); H04N 1/409 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06T 5/002 (2013.01); G06T 5/10 (2013.01); G06T 2207/20016 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2003612 A2 20081217; EP 2003612 A4 20101013; EP 2003612 A9 20090225; US 2009040386 A1 20090212; US 8244034 B2 20120814; WO 2007116543 A1 20071018

INPADOC legal status


2015-09-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NIKON CORPORATION

2012-08-01 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110510

2010-10-13 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100915

2010-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06T 5/00 20060101AFI20071211BHEP

2010-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 1/409 20060101ALI20100909BHEP

2010-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06T 5/10 20060101ALI20100909BHEP

2010-07-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NIKON CORPORATION

2008-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080829

2008-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR