Global Patent Index - EP 2006544 A3

EP 2006544 A3 2009-02-18 - Piston pump with variable eccentricity

Title (en)

Piston pump with variable eccentricity

Title (de)

Kolbenpumpe mit variabler Exzentrizität

Title (fr)

Pompe à pistons avec excentricité variable

Publication

EP 2006544 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 08005400 A

Priority

AT 9372007 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2006544A2] The pump has displacing units (6) movable from a mantle surface (18) of an eccentric sleeve (17) against fluid pressure, where the displacing units are movable radial to a main axis (16) of the pump. A spring unit (39) acts on the eccentric sleeve in an axial direction, and a pump shaft section (23) is formed as a narrow eccentric pin (24) with an eccentric pin axis (25), which runs to the main axis at an angle of inclination (26). The eccentric sleeve is guided to the eccentric pin and has a cylindrical mantle surface whose ends (20) run parallel to the main axis. An independent claim is also included for a method for driving a fluid driven motor of a hydraulic cylinder or a hydraulic motor.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/125 (2013.01); Y10T 83/869 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2006544 A2 20081224; EP 2006544 A3 20090218; EP 2006544 B1 20110112; AT 495364 T 20110115; AT 505439 A1 20090115; AT 505439 B1 20110315; DE 502008002260 D1 20110224; US 2010170377 A1 20100708; US 8322997 B2 20121204; WO 2008154665 A2 20081224; WO 2008154665 A3 20090219

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180313

- Year of fee payment: 11

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180302

- Year of fee payment: 11

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180305

- Year of fee payment: 11

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180305

- Year of fee payment: 11

2018-03-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-02-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130322

2014-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 495364 T

- Effective date: 20130322

2012-02-09 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008002260

- Effective date: 20111013

2011-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111013

2011-04-27 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2011-02-24 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008002260

- Effective date: 20110224

2011-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502008002260 P 20110224

2011-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

2011-01-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

2009-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090817

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04B 49/20 20060101AFI20090115BHEP

2008-12-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-12-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS