Global Patent Index - EP 2006768 A9

EP 2006768 A9 2009-02-25 - COMMUNICATION TERMINAL, USER DATA TRANSFERRING SYSTEM AND USER DATA TRANSFERRING METHOD

Title (en)

COMMUNICATION TERMINAL, USER DATA TRANSFERRING SYSTEM AND USER DATA TRANSFERRING METHOD

Title (de)

KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON BENUTZERDATEN

Title (fr)

TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT DE DONNÉES D'UTILISATEUR

Publication

EP 2006768 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 07741250 A

Priority

  • JP 2007057814 W
  • JP 2006106537 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2006768A2] A first communication terminal (100) is a communication terminal which executes an application using user data which can be output to a second communication terminal (200), and has a management data making section (140) which makes management data including an access information of a server (300) capable of transmitting the application, and a data transmitting section (152) which transmits the user data and the management data to the second communication terminal (200).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/445 (2006.01); G06K 19/00 (2006.01); G06K 19/077 (2006.01); G06Q 20/00 (2012.01); G06Q 20/06 (2012.01); H04M 3/42 (2006.01); H04W 4/00 (2009.01); H04W 76/02 (2009.01); H04W 92/18 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 20/363 (2013.01); G06Q 20/32 (2013.01); G06F 8/60 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2006768 A2 20081224; EP 2006768 A4 20100804; EP 2006768 A9 20090225; CN 101416159 A 20090422; CN 101416159 B 20130327; JP 2007281948 A 20071025; JP 4615474 B2 20110119; KR 100971896 B1 20100723; KR 20080098551 A 20081110; TW 200803442 A 20080101; TW I380674 B 20121221; US 2009287760 A1 20091119; US 8364793 B2 20130129; WO 2007116993 A1 20071018

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160304

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-08-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100706

2008-12-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081002

2008-12-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR