Global Patent Index - EP 2006836 A9

EP 2006836 A9 2009-02-25 - SPEAKER MODEL REGISTRATION DEVICE AND METHOD IN SPEAKER RECOGNITION SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM

Title (en)

SPEAKER MODEL REGISTRATION DEVICE AND METHOD IN SPEAKER RECOGNITION SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM

Title (de)

SPRECHERMODELL-REGISTRATIONSEINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN IN EINEM SPRECHERERKENNUNGSSYSTEM UND COMPUTERPROGRRAMM

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT DE MODELE DE HAUT-PARLEUR DANS UN SYSTEME DE RECONNAISSANCE DE HAUT-PARLEUR ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE

Publication

EP 2006836 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 07739119 A

Priority

  • JP 2007055676 W
  • JP 2006084276 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2006836A2] A speaker model registration device (10) in a speaker recognition system (1) includes: acquisition means (13) for acquiring n utterances (n is an integer not smaller than 2); similarity calculation means (15) for calculating a similarity indicating similarity between the n utterances acquired; and verification means (16) for verifying whether an inappropriate utterance having similarity not reaching a predetermined reference exists. The speaker model registration device (20) further includes: speaker model calculation means for calculating a speaker model according to the n utterances not including any inappropriate utterance if no inappropriate utterance exists as a result of the verification; and registration means (40) for registering the calculated speaker model as a speaker model for speaker recognition.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 17/00 (2006.01); G10L 15/06 (2006.01); G10L 17/04 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 17/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 2006836 A2 20081224; EP 2006836 A4 20100505; EP 2006836 A9 20090225; JP WO2007111197 A1 20090813; WO 2007111197 A1 20071004

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20110606

2011-06-06 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2011-01-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PIONEER CORPORATION

2010-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100826

2010-05-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100401

2009-04-22 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-12-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081009

2008-12-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB