Global Patent Index - EP 2007006 A9

EP 2007006 A9 2009-02-25 - INVERTER DEVICE AND AIR CONDITIONER

Title (en)

INVERTER DEVICE AND AIR CONDITIONER

Title (de)

UMRICHTER UND KLIMAANLAGE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ONDULEUR ET CONDITIONNEUR D'AIR

Publication

EP 2007006 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 07740868 A

Priority

  • JP 2007057432 W
  • JP 2006101768 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2007006A2] A rectification unit and a smoothing unit rectify and smooth the AC voltage from an AC power supply and generate a smooth voltage containing the waveform of a smooth voltage period corresponding to half the AC voltage period. A DC/AC conversion unit converts the smooth voltage to a drive voltage representing a pulse-width modulated alternating voltage, and supplies the drive voltage to a motor. A current detection unit detects the motor current flowing to the motor, which is current containing the waveform of the smooth voltage period and waveform distortion, and generates a current detection signal. A target speed setting unit generates a target speed signal representing the target speed of the motor. A voltage command output unit generates and outputs a voltage command signal representing the control level of the to-be-modulated signal for pulse width modulation based on the current detection signal and target speed signal. A voltage command correction unit generates a voltage command correction signal for correcting waveform distortion based on the current detection signal and target speed signal. A to-be-modulated signal generating unit and PWM generating unit add the voltage command signal and the voltage command correction signal, and generates a pulse width modulation signal.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02P 27/06 (2006.01); F24F 11/02 (2006.01); H02M 1/42 (2007.01); H02P 27/08 (2006.01); H02P 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02P 27/06 (2013.01); H02M 5/458 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 2007006 A2 20081224; EP 2007006 A4 20130626; EP 2007006 A9 20090225; EP 2007006 B1 20140702; CN 101416379 A 20090422; CN 101416379 B 20110209; ES 2493394 T3 20140911; JP 5114387 B2 20130109; JP WO2007116873 A1 20090820; WO 2007116873 A1 20071018

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160404

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160403

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150428

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-06-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20150407

2015-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-09-11 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2493394 T3

- Effective date: 20140911

2014-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2014-03-12 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FUKUE, TAKASHI

2014-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OGAWA, MASANORI

2014-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MATSUSHIRO, HIDEO

2014-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02P 27/06 20060101AFI20140121BHEP

2014-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24F 11/02 20060101ALI20140121BHEP

2014-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02M 1/42 20070101ALI20140121BHEP

2014-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02P 29/00 20060101ALI20140121BHEP

2014-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02P 27/08 20060101ALI20140121BHEP

2013-06-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130524

2013-06-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02P 27/08 20060101ALI20130517BHEP

2013-06-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02M 1/42 20070101ALI20130517BHEP

2013-06-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02P 27/06 20060101AFI20130517BHEP

2013-06-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02P 29/00 20060101ALI20130517BHEP

2013-06-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24F 11/02 20060101ALI20130517BHEP

2009-04-29 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2008-12-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081103

2008-12-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT