Global Patent Index - EP 2007694 B1

EP 2007694 B1 2013-09-04 - WEATHER-RESISTANT LAYER SYSTEM

Title (en)

WEATHER-RESISTANT LAYER SYSTEM

Title (de)

WITTERUNGSBESTÄNDIGES SCHICHTSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTÈME STRATIFIÉ RÉSISTANT AUX CONDITIONS MÉTÉOROLOGIQUES

Publication

EP 2007694 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 07724053 A

Priority

  • EP 2007003112 W
  • DE 102006016512 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007115796A2] The invention relates to a layer system applied to a transparent substrate with one or more barrier layers embedded in the functional layers.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03C 17/34 (2006.01); C03C 17/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C03C 17/3417 (2013.01); C03C 17/3423 (2013.01); C03C 17/3435 (2013.01); C03C 17/3441 (2013.01); C03C 17/36 (2013.01); C03C 17/3618 (2013.01); C03C 17/3626 (2013.01); C03C 17/3634 (2013.01); C03C 17/3644 (2013.01); C03C 17/3649 (2013.01); C03C 17/3652 (2013.01); C03C 17/3655 (2013.01); C03C 17/366 (2013.01); C03C 2217/71 (2013.01); C03C 2217/94 (2013.01); Y10T 428/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007115796 A2 20071018; WO 2007115796 A3 20080124; EP 2007694 A2 20081231; EP 2007694 B1 20130904; US 2009117371 A1 20090507

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180328

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-11-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE

- Effective date: 20140604

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-08-14 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 502007012234

- Effective date: 20140604

2014-07-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE

- Effective date: 20140604

2013-10-31 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007012234

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB TR

2013-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2013-08-14 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130717

2013-07-24 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130627

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-12-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTERPLANE ENTWICKLUNGS-UND-BERATUNGSGESELLSCHAFT

2009-08-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090717

2009-05-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB TR

2008-12-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080827

2008-12-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-12-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS