Global Patent Index - EP 2009152 B1

EP 2009152 B1 2010-02-24 - Fiber bundle guiding device for a spinning machine

Title (en)

Fiber bundle guiding device for a spinning machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Führung von Faserbündeln für eine Spinnmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de guidage de faisceaux de fibres pour machine à filer

Publication

EP 2009152 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 08157270 A

Priority

JP 2007147177 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2009152A1] A fiber bundle guiding device (30) for a spinning guides a fiber bundle to reduce the width of the fiber bundle. The fiber bundle guiding device includes guide members (31) which have a guide surface (31A) whose width is reduced along the moving direction of the fiber bundle to be guided. The guide members are disposed at an interval corresponding to the spaced distance between at least two adjacent spindles. A connecting member (35,36) connects the guide members and has a rod like shape extending in the direction perpendicular to the guide members. An electronic component (34) is used for vibrating the connecting member longitudinally and arranged at the intermediate portion of the connecting member. A vibrating mechanism (32) vibrates the guide members to generate a sound pressure for reducing the width of the fiber bundle. The vibrating mechanism includes the connecting member (35,36) and the electronic component (34).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/72 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 2009152 A1 20081231; EP 2009152 B1 20100224; CN 101314876 A 20081203; CN 101314876 B 20110406; DE 602008000689 D1 20100408; JP 2008297677 A 20081211

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160530

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-12-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602008000689

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150515

- Year of fee payment: 8

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150512

- Year of fee payment: 8

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 8

2011-05-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

- Free text: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI#2-1, TOYODA-CHO#KARIYA-SHI, AICHI 448-8671 (JP) -TRANSFER TO- KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI#2-1, TOYODA-CHO#KARIYA-SHI, AICHI 448-8671 (JP)

2011-02-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101125

2010-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: NOVAGRAAF INTERNATIONAL SA

2010-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602008000689 P 20100408

2010-02-26 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2009-09-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2008-12-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080530

2008-12-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-12-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS