Global Patent Index - EP 2009153 A9

EP 2009153 A9 2009-02-25 - Device and thread guiding ring for a ring spinning machine or twisting machine

Title (en)

Device and thread guiding ring for a ring spinning machine or twisting machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Fadenführungsring für eine Ringspinn- oder Zwirnmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif et anneau de guidage de fil pour continu à filer ou retordeuse

Publication

EP 2009153 A9 (DE)

Application

EP 08153817 A

Priority

DE 102007029505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2009153A1] The device has a thread guiding ring (6) with a thread guiding element (5) for twisting and deflecting a running thread. The ring is rotatably arranged at a retaining unit (7) around a rotation axis (A). Force generating units (12, 13) are provided for pressurizing the ring with axial force (AK), which effects constantly to operate the device. A sliding section (14) is formed at the ring and is pushed against another sliding section (15) that is formed at the retaining unit, in order to axially mount the ring. The sliding sections are designed as anti-friction surfaces.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/56 (2006.01); D01H 7/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/56 (2013.01); D01H 7/58 (2013.01); D01H 7/585 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2009153 A1 20081231; EP 2009153 A9 20090225; EP 2009153 B1 20120201; CN 101333712 A 20081231; CN 101333712 B 20111109; DE 102007029505 A1 20090108

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170331

2018-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170331

2018-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170331

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171003

2017-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-10-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502008006280

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151209

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-02-28 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008006280

- Effective date: 20121105

2013-01-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121105

2012-03-29 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008006280

- Effective date: 20120329

2012-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2009-09-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2009-07-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090616

2008-12-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-12-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS