EP 2010991 A4 20110601 - FIELD DEVICE EDITOR TOOL
Title (en)
FIELD DEVICE EDITOR TOOL
Title (de)
EDITOR-WERKZEUG FÜR FELDGERÄT
Title (fr)
OUTIL D'ÉDITION DE DISPOSITIF DE TERRAIN
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 2007066394 W 20070411
- US 40322406 A 20060411
- US 40322606 A 20060411
- US 40322806 A 20060411
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2007121141A2] A method and user interfaces are described herein installing a field device as a replacement for a previously installed field device of a same type in a process control system. The disclosed method includes initially specifying a device type commissioning definition that includes a set of device-type specific parameters. A first set of instance-specific configuration parameter values are then stored for a first field device. When replacing the first field device by a second field device of the same type on a process control network, the commissioning definition and the previously stored parameters for the first device are used to automatically configure the second device.
IPC 8 full level
G06F 3/00 (2006.01); G01R 31/26 (2006.01); G06F 15/177 (2006.01); H01L 21/66 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G05B 19/41845 (2013.01); G05B 2219/31121 (2013.01); G05B 2219/31132 (2013.01); G05B 2219/31334 (2013.01); G05B 2219/32137 (2013.01); G05B 2219/32144 (2013.01); Y02P 90/02 (2015.11)
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 6449715 B1 20020910 - KRIVOSHEIN KENNETH D [US]
- [A] PROFIBUS NUTZERORGANISATION: "PROFIBUS Guideline, Specification for PROFIBUS Device Description and Device Integration", 20010501, 1 May 2001 (2001-05-01), XP002632935
- See references of WO 2007121218A2
Citation (examination)
- 20 March 2006 (2006-03-20), Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://web.archive.org/web/20060320164446/https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Floppy_disk> [retrieved on 20170731]
- M&M SOFTWARE: "The FDT-Integration", September 2003 (2003-09-01), Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://extranet.mm-software.com/FDT-Platform/about-fdt/General%20Information/Articles/MM_The_FDT-Integration.pdf> [retrieved on 20180118]
- ROONEY O: "Using container components' for fast track FDT integration", CONTROL ENGINEERING EU, CAHNERS BUSINESS INFORMATION, HIGHLANDS RANCH, CO, US, 1 September 2003 (2003-09-01), pages 30 - 32, XP009051868, ISSN: 1542-5584
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2007121141 A2 20071025; WO 2007121141 A3 20080214; CN 101460928 A 20090617; CN 101460928 B 20120208; EP 2010991 A2 20090107; EP 2010991 A4 20110601; EP 2011009 A2 20090107; EP 2011009 A4 20110629; WO 2007121218 A2 20071025; WO 2007121218 A3 20080918
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2007066244 W 20070409; CN 200780020775 A 20070409; EP 07760328 A 20070409; EP 07760453 A 20070411; US 2007066394 W 20070411