Global Patent Index - EP 2014376 A3

EP 2014376 A3 2009-02-04 - Curtain coating machine

Title (en)

Curtain coating machine

Title (de)

Vorhangstreichmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine de revêtement par rideau

Publication

EP 2014376 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 08160070 A

Priority

JP 2007184492 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2014376A2] The coating machine has a head (1) and a width-setting device (9), consisting of a pair of adjustable edge guides (3), a pair of auxiliary guides (4) and a pair of dividing plates (5). The surfaces of the inner side of the edge guides, the inner side of the auxiliary guides and the inner side of the dividing plates, forms a single vertical guide surface.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2014376 A2 20090114; EP 2014376 A3 20090204; JP 2009018285 A 20090129; JP 5239008 B2 20130717

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101019

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090827

2009-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090804

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS