Global Patent Index - EP 2014818 A3

EP 2014818 A3 2009-02-18 - Anti-flooding safety device for household appliances

Title (en)

Anti-flooding safety device for household appliances

Title (de)

Überlaufschutzvorrichtung für Haushaltsgeräte, besonders für Waschgeräte

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité anti-écoulement pour appareils électroménagers, notamment pour machines à laver

Publication

EP 2014818 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 08165774 A

Priority

  • EP 06125957 A
  • IT TO20050876 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1798326A1] An anti-flooding safety device for an electrical household appliance comprises a connector body (2,40), connected to which are the first ends of a first and a second flexible pipes (20,30), at least one part of the first pipe (20) extending longitudinally inside the second pipe (30). The two pipes (20,30) are of a corrugated type, and the device (1) comprises at least one safety solenoid valve (4), mounted on the connector body (2). At least one end portion of the first pipe (20) is coupled to a first end portion (21a) of a tubular element (21,23), preferably made of elastic synthetic material. The tubular element (21,23) has at least one axial stretch of surface structured so as to engage with an axial stretch of surface of the first pipe (20). A second end portion (21b) of the tubular element (21) is engaged or fitted on a coupling part (2a) of the connector body (2,40).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/081 (2013.01); A47L 15/421 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1798326 A1 20070620; EP 1798326 B1 20090624; EP 1798326 B2 20120111; AT 434678 T 20090715; DE 602006007426 D1 20090806; EP 2014818 A2 20090114; EP 2014818 A3 20090218; EP 2014818 B1 20180613; EP 2314752 A1 20110427; EP 2314752 B1 20130417; ES 2328513 T3 20091113; ES 2328513 T5 20120516; ES 2420782 T3 20130826; IT TO20050876 A1 20070616

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2018-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-06-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 1007612 T

- Effective date: 20180615

2018-06-13 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1798326 P

2018-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2018-06-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2018-05-16 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180416

2018-04-11 [INTC] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT (DELETED)

2017-12-27 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20171128

2017-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 39/08 20060101ALI20171026BHEP

2017-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47L 15/42 20060101AFI20171026BHEP

2017-10-26 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 602006055640

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: D06F0039080000

- IPC: A47L0015420000

2016-07-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160610

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090414

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-01-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1798326 P

2009-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR