Global Patent Index - EP 2016841 A3

EP 2016841 A3 2009-02-25 - Rolling papers and methods for packing same

Title (en)

Rolling papers and methods for packing same

Title (de)

Zigarettenblättchen und Verfahren zu deren Verpackung

Title (fr)

Papiers à rouler et leurs procédés d'emballage

Publication

EP 2016841 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 08010428 A

Priority

US 77803507 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2016841A2] Rolling papers and apparatus for holding rolling papers are provided, In one aspect of the invention, a stack of individually removable rolling papers is provided, the stack including a spine (2, 22, 32), an initial sheet (18) disposed on the spine (2, 22, 32), an end sheet (19) disposed on the spine (2, 22, 32), and a plurality of sheets (20) disposed on the spine (2, 22, 32) between the initial sheet (18) and the end sheet (19) with each of the initial sheet (18) , the end sheet (19), and the plurality of sheets (20) therebetween having an adhesive (4, 24, 34) disposed thereon and the adhesive (4, 24, 34) is coupled to the spine (2, 22, 32) to define a gummed edge (7), and the spine (2, 22, 32) separates each of the gummed edge (7) from a proceeding gummed edge (7).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24F 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24F 17/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2016841 A2 20090121; EP 2016841 A3 20090225; US 2009014342 A1 20090115

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-03-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090826

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HBI EUROPE GMBH

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS