Global Patent Index - EP 2017373 A3

EP 2017373 A3 2013-09-11 - High speed method for plating palladium and palladium alloys

Title (en)

High speed method for plating palladium and palladium alloys

Title (de)

Hochgeschwindigkeitsverfahren zur Plattierung von Palladium und Palladiumlegierungen

Title (fr)

Procédé grande vitesse pour le placage de palladium et d'alliages de palladium

Publication

EP 2017373 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 08160839 A

Priority

US 96139307 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2017373A2] A high speed method of depositing palladium and palladium alloys is disclosed. The high speed method uses an aqueous, ammonia-based bath which has reduced free ammonia in the bath. The high speed method may be used to deposit palladium and palladium alloy coatings on various substrates such as electrical devices and jewelry.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/50 (2013.01); C25D 3/567 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] JP H0711475 A 19950113 - KOJIMA KAGAKU YAKUHIN KK
  • [Y] US 4673472 A 19870616 - MORRISSEY RONALD J [US], et al
  • [A] US 6251249 B1 20010626 - CHEVALIER JEAN W [US], et al
  • [A] WALZ ET AL: "DIE GALVANISCHE ABSCHEIDUNG VON PALLADIUM-NICKEL-LEGIERUNGEN AUS DEM AMMONIAKALISCHEN CHLORIDELEKTROLYTEN", MO METALLOBERFLACHE, IGT INFORMATIONSGESELLSCHAFT TECHNIK, MUNCHEN, DE, vol. 40, no. 3, 1 March 1986 (1986-03-01), pages 112 - 118, XP008163844, ISSN: 0026-0797

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2017373 A2 20090121; EP 2017373 A3 20130911; CN 101348928 A 20090121; CN 101348928 B 20120704; TW 200923140 A 20090601; TW I391533 B 20130401; US 2009038950 A1 20090212

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2013-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130906

2013-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C25D 3/50 20060101AFI20130805BHEP

2009-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080721

2009-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS