Global Patent Index - EP 2017405 A3

EP 2017405 A3 2009-02-18 - Applicator with notched filling knife and adhesive composition for installing parquet flooring

Title (en)

Applicator with notched filling knife and adhesive composition for installing parquet flooring

Title (de)

Applikator mit Zahnspachtel und Kleberzusammensetzung zur Parkettverlegung

Title (fr)

Applicateur à spatule crantée et composition adhésive pour pose de parquet

Publication

EP 2017405 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 08290689 A

Priority

  • FR 0705246 A
  • FR 0707694 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2017405A2] The applicator (1) with notched spatula (2), comprises a gripping unit (3) comprising a shaft connected to the spatula. The spatula comprises a rectilinear warp (2c) at its edge equipped with four U-shaped rectangular notches (4) that are identically and regularly spaced at a distance of 4 cm. The notches have a length of 10-15 mm and height of 10-12 mm. The warp edge has a length of 25 cm. The spatula is indirectly connected to the gripping unit by an intermediate rod having a length thus allowing an operator to work in erect position. The applicator (1) with notched spatula (2), comprises a gripping unit (3) comprising a shaft connected to the spatula. The spatula comprises a rectilinear warp (2c) at its edge equipped with four U-shaped rectangular notches (4) that are identically and regularly spaced at a distance of 4 cm. The notches have a length of 10-15 mm and height of 10-12 mm. The warp edge has a length of 25 cm. The spatula is indirectly connected to the gripping unit by an intermediate rod having a length thus allowing an operator to work in erect position. Fine teeth consisting of opposite cavities are arranged in the spatula. The cavities are present in the form of isosceles triangle that are identically and regularly spaced at a distance of 1-2 mm and has a base and height of 1.5-2.5 mm and 1-2 mm respectively. Independent claims are included for: (1) a process for posing a coating on a rigid soil; and (2) an adhesive composition.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 21/02 (2006.01); B05C 17/10 (2006.01); C09J 5/00 (2006.01); C09J 11/08 (2006.01); E04F 21/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 21/02 (2013.01); E04F 21/162 (2013.01); E04F 21/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2017405 A2 20090121; EP 2017405 A3 20090218

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151208

2014-10-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSTIK SA

2010-01-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSTIK SA

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090915

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080715

2009-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS