Global Patent Index - EP 2019581 A2

EP 2019581 A2 2009-02-04 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE INJECTION OF VISCOUS FERTILIZER BELOW THE SURFACE OF THE SOIL

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE INJECTION OF VISCOUS FERTILIZER BELOW THE SURFACE OF THE SOIL

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINSPRITZEN EINES VISKOSEN DÜNGEMITTELS UNTER DIE ERDOBERFLÄCHE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR L'INJECTION D'UN FERTILISANT VISQUEUX SOUS LA SURFACE DU SOL

Publication

EP 2019581 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06751366 A

Priority

US 2006015633 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007133181A2] The invention pertains to apparatus and methods for injecting viscous fertilizer, such as dewatered biosolids, below the surface of the soil. The invention also pertains to apparatus and methods for creating a continuous flow of viscous material and for dividing a flow of viscous material.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01C 23/02 (2006.01); A01C 23/00 (2006.01); B60P 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01C 23/022 (2013.01); B60P 1/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007133181 A2 20071122; WO 2007133181 A3 20090430; CA 2650148 A1 20071122; CA 2650148 C 20110201; EP 2019581 A2 20090204; EP 2019581 A4 20121010; MX 2008013672 A 20090528

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20131008

2013-06-19 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130527

2013-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60P 1/00 20060101ALI20130503BHEP

2013-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A01C 23/00 20060101ALI20130503BHEP

2013-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A01C 23/02 20060101AFI20130503BHEP

2012-10-10 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20120911

2012-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A01C 23/00 20060101ALI20120905BHEP

2012-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A01C 23/02 20060101AFI20120905BHEP

2012-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60P 1/00 20060101ALI20120905BHEP

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-06-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A01C 23/00 20060101AFI20090512BHEP

2009-06-03 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081124

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU