Global Patent Index - EP 2019711 A1

EP 2019711 A1 2009-02-04 - DEVICE FOR PERIPHERAL INFORMATION INPUT IN TEST SUBJECTS BY MEANS OF ELECTRICAL FIELDS AND CURRENTS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PERIPHERAL INFORMATION INPUT IN TEST SUBJECTS BY MEANS OF ELECTRICAL FIELDS AND CURRENTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR PERIPHEREN INFORMATIONSEINKOPPLUNG BEI PROBANDEN MITTELS ELEKTRISCHER FELDER UND STRÖME

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LE COUPLAGE PÉRIPHÉRIQUE D'INFORMATIONS CHEZ DES SUJETS À EXAMINER AU MOYEN DE CHAMPS ET COURANTS ÉLECTRIQUES

Publication

EP 2019711 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06755199 A

Priority

EP 2006062322 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131550A1] The invention relates to a device for peripheral information input in test subjects by means of electrical fields and currents, with at least one electrical contacting means for a part of the body or a limb of the test subject, which means is arranged releasably relative to the test subject. The electrical contacting means consists of an insulating textile support material whose inner face is provided at least in some areas with electrically conductive surfaces, wherein the conductive surfaces are either electrically connected to one another and lead to a common outer contacting means or are each in communication with a separate outer contacting means. The shape of the textile support material is adapted to the anatomy of the particular body part or the particular limb of the test subject and is preferably in the form of a stocking, a sock, a gaiter, a headband or a glove.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/32 (2013.01); A61N 1/0484 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131550A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007131550 A1 20071122; AU 2006343489 A1 20071122; AU 2006343489 B2 20110825; EP 2019711 A1 20090204; US 2009312826 A1 20091217

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20130610

2013-06-10 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2013-05-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ACTEGY LIMITED

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20101021

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PENNY, STEWART

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRAUSS, MANFRED

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GROHMANN, GERALD

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MOEBIUS, MARIO

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081028

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU