Global Patent Index - EP 2019730 A1

EP 2019730 A1 2009-02-04 - OXIDATION CATALYST FOR THE PURIFICATION OF NITROGEN GAS CONTAINING ORGANIC IMPURITIES

Title (en)

OXIDATION CATALYST FOR THE PURIFICATION OF NITROGEN GAS CONTAINING ORGANIC IMPURITIES

Title (de)

OXIDATIONSKATALYSATOR ZUR REINIGUNG VON ORGANISCHE VERUNREINIGUNGEN ENTHALTENDEM STICKSTOFFGAS

Title (fr)

CATALYSEUR D'OXYDATION POUR LA PURIFICATION DU GAZ D'AZOTE CONTENANT DES IMPURETES ORGANIQUES

Publication

EP 2019730 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06842729 A

Priority

  • IN 2006000324 W
  • IN 684MU2006 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007125539A1] An oxidation catalyst for the purification of nitrogen gas containing organic impurities. The catalyst comprises sulphated alumina with a sulphate loading of 1-20 percent weight alumina. The sulphated alumina is impregnated with an aqueous solution of a noble metal complex formed with a complexing agent. The noble metal content of the catalyst is 0.1 to 1 percent weight alumina and the surface penetration of the noble metal on the alumina is 100-150 microns. Also a method of preparing the oxidation catalyst by sulphating alumina with a sulphating agent to a sulphate loading of 1- 20 percent weight alumina; drying the alumina at 110-160ºC; calcining the alumina at 520-560ºC; complexing a noble metal in 0.1 to 1 percent weight alumina with a complexing agent; impregnating the sulphated alumina with an aqueous solution of the noble metal complex; drying the catalyst material at 110-160ºC; calcining the catalyst material at 520-560°C; reducing the catalyst material with hydrogen at 470-500ºC; and passivating the catalyst material by cooling it down to 25-50ºC in an inert atmosphere.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 23/40 (2006.01); B01D 53/44 (2006.01); B01J 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/8628 (2013.01); B01J 27/053 (2013.01); B01J 37/0203 (2013.01); B01D 2255/1021 (2013.01); B01D 2255/2092 (2013.01); B01J 33/00 (2013.01); B01J 35/008 (2013.01); B01J 35/08 (2013.01); B01J 35/1019 (2013.01); B01J 35/1061 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007125539 A1 20071108; EP 2019730 A1 20090204; EP 2019730 A4 20101222

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-01 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-10-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110912

2010-12-22 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20101123

2009-02-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RELIANCE INDUSTRIES LIMITED

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS