Global Patent Index - EP 2019732 A1

EP 2019732 A1 2009-02-04 - FLUID DISPENSING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MAKING A MOBILE VALVE MEMBER

Title (en)

FLUID DISPENSING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MAKING A MOBILE VALVE MEMBER

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGKEITSAUSGABEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BEWEGLICHEN VENTILELEMENTS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUIT FLUIDE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ORGANE MOBILE DE CLAPET

Publication

EP 2019732 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07765988 A

Priority

  • FR 2007051205 W
  • FR 0651614 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2007256748A1] A fluid dispenser device ( 1 ) for associating with a fluid reservoir ( 3 ), the device including at least one check valve ( 12, 2 ) that is suitable for controlling the flow of fluid through the device, the check valve comprising a seat ( 12 ), and a movable valve member ( 2 ) that defines a contact zone that is suitable for bearing against the seat ( 12 ) in leaktight manner, the device including resilient prestress means ( 23 ) that urge the valve member in leaktight contact against its seat ( 12 ) at rest, the device being characterized in that the prestress means ( 23 ) are formed integrally with the valve member.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3067 (2013.01); B05B 11/3001 (2013.01); Y10T 137/789 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007128934A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

FR 2900646 A1 20071109; FR 2900646 B1 20101231; BR PI0711298 A2 20111116; CN 101472684 A 20090701; CN 101472684 B 20120613; EP 2019732 A1 20090204; JP 2009535267 A 20091001; JP 5099929 B2 20121219; US 2007256748 A1 20071108; WO 2007128934 A1 20071115

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20131203

2012-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS

2012-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120416

2009-05-27 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081128

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS