Global Patent Index - EP 2019750 A2

EP 2019750 A2 2009-02-04 - CARBON NANOTUBE-REINFORCED NANOCOMPOSITES

Title (en)

CARBON NANOTUBE-REINFORCED NANOCOMPOSITES

Title (de)

MIT KOHLENSTOFFNANORÖHRCHEN VERSTÄRKTE NANOKOMPOSITE

Title (fr)

NANOCOMPOSITES RENFORCÉS PAR DES NANOTUBES DE CARBONE

Publication

EP 2019750 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07759819 A

Priority

  • US 2007065630 W
  • US 78823406 P
  • US 81039406 P
  • US 81931906 P
  • US 69345407 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007115162A2] A combination of MWNTs (herein, MWNTs have more than 2 walls) and DWNTs significantly improves the mechanical properties of polymer nanocomposites. A small amount of DWNTs reinforcment (<1wt.%) significantly improves the flexural strength of epoxy matrix nanocomposites. A same or similar amount of MWNTs reinforcement significantly improves the flexural modulus (stiffness) of epoxy matrix nanocomposites. Both flexural strength and flexural modulus of the MWNTs and DWNTs-coreinforced epoxy nanocomposites are further improved compared with same amount of either DWNTs or MWNTs-reinforced epoxy nanocomposites. In this epoxy/DWNTs/MWNTs nanocomposite system, SWNTs may also work instead of DWNTs. Besides epoxy, other thermoset polymers may also work.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 27/38 (2006.01); B32B 27/04 (2006.01); C08J 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08K 7/24 (2013.01); C08K 2201/011 (2013.01); C08K 2201/014 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08K 7/24 + C08L 63/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007115162 A2 20071011; WO 2007115162 A3 20080731; CA 2647727 A1 20071011; EP 2019750 A2 20090204; EP 2019750 A4 20090902; JP 2009532531 A 20090910; KR 20090025194 A 20090310

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151001

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091008

2009-09-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090805

2009-09-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B32B 27/38 20060101AFI20081103BHEP

2009-09-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B32B 27/04 20060101ALI20090730BHEP

2009-09-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08J 5/00 20060101ALI20090730BHEP

2009-04-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAO, DONGSHENG

2009-04-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YANIV, ZVI

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081028

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS