Global Patent Index - EP 2019897 A1

EP 2019897 A1 2009-02-04 - UNIT FOR FABRICATING FLAT SCREENS AND THE LIKE AND METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION

Title (en)

UNIT FOR FABRICATING FLAT SCREENS AND THE LIKE AND METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION

Title (de)

EINHEIT ZUR FERTIGUNG VON FLACHBILDSCHIRMEN UND DGL. UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

UNITÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ÉCRANS PLATS ET SIMILAIRES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 2019897 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07722442 A

Priority

  • DE 2007000894 W
  • DE 102006022769 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131500A1] A description is given of a unit comprising two glass panels that are connected to each other by means of a connecting medium, in particular a glass frit, and have an intermediate space, for fabricating flat screens, flat discharge lamps and the like. The unit has a device, extending from the intermediate space to the outside for filling with a process gas. The filling device is arranged parallel to the plane of the glass panels and extends through the side wall of the unit. As a result, the unit is of a particularly compact form. Furthermore, a method for producing such a unit is explained.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/677 (2006.01); H01J 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/677 (2013.01); H01J 7/22 (2013.01); H01J 9/248 (2013.01); H01J 9/395 (2013.01); H01J 61/305 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131500A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006022769 A1 20071122; EP 2019897 A1 20090204; WO 2007131500 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2015-06-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20141202

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-10-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110907

2010-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELINO INDUSTRIE-OFENBAU GMBH

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081212

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS