Global Patent Index - EP 2019913 A1

EP 2019913 A1 2009-02-04 - BLADE/DISK DOVETAIL BACKCUT FOR BLADE/DISK STRESS REDUCTION (6FA+e, STAGE 2)

Title (en)

BLADE/DISK DOVETAIL BACKCUT FOR BLADE/DISK STRESS REDUCTION (6FA+e, STAGE 2)

Title (de)

SCHAUFEL/SCHEIBEN-SCHWALBENSCHWANZHINTERSCHNITT FÜR SCHAUFEL/SCHEIBEN-SPANNUNGSREDUZIERUNG (6FA+E, STUFE 2)

Title (fr)

CONTRE-DÉCOUPE EN QUEUE D'ARONDE DE PALE/DISQUE POUR UNE RÉDUCTION DE LA CONTRAINTE PALE/DISQUE (6FA+E, ÉTAPE 2)

Publication

EP 2019913 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06759705 A

Priority

US 2006018473 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007133204A1] Blade load path on a gas turbine disk can be diverted to provide a significant disk fatigue life benefit. A plurality of gas turbine blades are attachable to a gas turbine disk, where each of the gas turbine blades includes a blade dovetail engageable in a correspondingly-shaped dovetail slot in the gas turbine disk. In order to reduce gas turbine disk stress, an optimal material removal area is defined according to blade and/or disk geometry to maximize a balance between stress reduction on the gas turbine disk, a useful life of the gas turbine blade, and maintaining or improving the aeromechanical behavior of the gas turbine blade. Removing material from the material removal area effects the maximized balance.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/3007 (2013.01); F05D 2230/10 (2013.01); F05D 2250/193 (2013.01); F05D 2260/941 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007133204 A1 20071122; CN 101438029 A 20090520; CN 101438029 B 20120530; EP 2019913 A1 20090204; EP 2019913 A4 20110601; JP 2009536994 A 20091022

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120810

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2012-02-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120130

2011-06-01 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20110502

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081212

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU