Global Patent Index - EP 2019921 A2

EP 2019921 A2 2009-02-04 - COMBUSTION APPARATUS WITH FUEL PRE-HEATING

Title (en)

COMBUSTION APPARATUS WITH FUEL PRE-HEATING

Title (de)

VERBRENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT BRENNSTOFFVORERWÄRMUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE COMBUSTION AVEC PRECHAUFFAGE DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 2019921 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07732303 A

Priority

  • GB 2007001255 W
  • GB 0606813 A
  • GB 0704149 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2436855A] A combustion apparatus such as a diesel engine (16) has an air inlet system (20,22) through which air can be drawn air from the atmosphere to the engine, a fuel supply system (28,30,32) for supplying fuel to the engine, an exhaust system (34,36,38,40,42) for exhausting combustion gas from the engine to the atmosphere and an exhaust gas recirculation system (44,46) for feeding a proportion of the exhaust gas from the exhaust system to the air inlet system so as to reduce NO and NO2 emissions by the engine. A heat exchanger (48) is provided between the exhaust gas recirculation system and the fuel supply system so that, in use, heat is transferred from the recirculating exhaust gas to the fuel not only so as to cool the recirculating exhaust gas and thus enhance the reduction of NO and NO2 emissions but also so as to warm the fuel and thus improve the combustion efficiency of the engine. In a front-engined motor vehicle, the heat exchanger can conveniently be disposed beneath the vehicle so as not to take up space in the vehicle's engine compartment.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/07 (2006.01); F02M 27/08 (2006.01); F02M 31/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 31/08 (2013.01); F01N 5/02 (2013.01); F01N 13/009 (2014.06); F02M 26/28 (2016.02); F02M 26/30 (2016.02); F02M 26/32 (2016.02); F02M 31/14 (2013.01); F02M 31/16 (2013.01); F02M 53/02 (2013.01); F01N 2230/04 (2013.01); F01N 2410/00 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01); F02M 26/15 (2016.02); F02M 26/25 (2016.02); F02M 2026/004 (2016.02); Y02T 10/126 (2013.01); Y02T 10/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007113569A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

GB 0606813 D0 20060517; GB 2436855 A 20071010; EP 2019921 A2 20090204; GB 0704149 D0 20070411; US 2009176178 A1 20090709; WO 2007113569 A2 20071011; WO 2007113569 A3 20071129

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110203

2010-10-13 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-05-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENVIROTECH LIMITED

2009-05-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DAVIES, DAVID

2009-03-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAVIES, DAVID

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DAVIES, DAVID

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081105

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS