Global Patent Index - EP 2019928 A1

EP 2019928 A1 2009-02-04 - TENSIONING OR DEFLECTOR PULLEY IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BELT DRIVE ON AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

TENSIONING OR DEFLECTOR PULLEY IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BELT DRIVE ON AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

SPANN- ODER UMLENKROLLE, INSBESONDERE FÜR DEN ZUGMITTELTRIEB EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

GALET DE TENSION OU DE RENVOI, EN PARTICULIER POUR L'ENTRAÎNEMENT PAR ÉLÉMENT DE TRACTION D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 2019928 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07722402 A

Priority

  • DE 2007000853 W
  • DE 102006022766 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131479A1] The invention relates to a tensioning or deflector pulley, in particular for the belt drive on an internal combustion engine, essentially comprising a plastic or steel running pulley (2), formed by an inner hub ring (3), an outer running ring (4) and a pulley disc (5), connecting both rings (3, 4) to each other, with a radial roller bearing (6) fixed in the hub ring (5) of the running pulley (2), made up of an inner bearing ring (7) and an outer bearing ring (8) with a number of roller bodies (12) running between the bearing rings (7, 8) in channeled running tracks (9, 10), retained at regular separations from each other by a bearing cage (11) with a seal (13, 14) to both sides of the roller bodies (12), by means of which the cavity (15), formed between the bearing rings (7, 8) and designed as a grease reservoir, is sealed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16C 33/36 (2006.01); F16C 33/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16C 13/006 (2013.01); F16C 19/26 (2013.01); F16C 19/28 (2013.01); F16C 33/36 (2013.01); F16C 33/6607 (2013.01); F16C 33/7859 (2013.01); F16C 2361/63 (2013.01); F16H 2007/0865 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131479A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006022766 A1 20071122; CN 101449070 A 20090603; EP 2019928 A1 20090204; US 2009098967 A1 20090416; US 8235851 B2 20120807; WO 2007131479 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-01 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-03-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG

2015-02-27 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2014-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140411

2014-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2012-03-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG

2009-06-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: EIDLOTH, RAINER

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHENK, RAINER

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GOPPELT, GEORG

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081216

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS