Global Patent Index - EP 2019929 A1

EP 2019929 A1 2009-02-04 - ROLLING ELEMENT BEARING WITH DIFFERENT GUIDE POCKETS

Title (en)

ROLLING ELEMENT BEARING WITH DIFFERENT GUIDE POCKETS

Title (de)

WÄLZLAGER MIT UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN FÜHRUNGSTASCHEN

Title (fr)

PALIER À ROULEMENT COMPORTANT DIFFÉRENTES POCHES DE GUIDAGE

Publication

EP 2019929 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07722454 A

Priority

  • DE 2007000924 W
  • DE 102006024376 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007134591A1] The invention relates to a rolling element bearing comprising a cage (01) with at least one first group of guide pockets (04, 06, 07, 08) in which rolling bodies are guided with a certain play. According to the invention, the degree of play is different at least in a first guide pocket (04) of the first group from the degree of play in a second guide pocket (06) of said first group of guide pockets.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16C 33/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16C 33/427 (2013.01); F16C 33/3887 (2013.01); F16C 2240/46 (2013.01); F16C 2300/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007134591A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006024376 A1 20071129; DE 102006024376 B4 20160324; CN 101484714 A 20090715; CN 101484714 B 20110608; EP 2019929 A1 20090204; JP 2009537773 A 20091029; KR 20090018969 A 20090224; US 2009290826 A1 20091126; WO 2007134591 A1 20071129

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120828

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2012-03-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG

2010-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG

2010-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100812

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081125

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS