Global Patent Index - EP 2019946 A2

EP 2019946 A2 2009-02-04 - CERAMIC HEATING ELEMENTS

Title (en)

CERAMIC HEATING ELEMENTS

Title (de)

KERAMISCHE HEIZELEMENTE

Title (fr)

ELEMENTS DE CHAUFFAGE CERAMIQUES

Publication

EP 2019946 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07794595 A

Priority

  • US 2007010975 W
  • US 79826606 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007130658A2] New methods are provided or manufacture ceramic resistive igniter elements that include sintering of the elements in the absence of substantially elevated pressures. Ceramic igniters also are provided that are obtainable from fabrication methods of the invention.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/22 (2013.01); H05B 3/141 (2013.01); H05B 2203/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007130658 A2 20071115; WO 2007130658 A3 20080410; BR PI0711313 A2 20111206; CA 2651001 A1 20071115; CN 101484755 A 20090715; EP 2019946 A2 20090204; EP 2019946 A4 20111005; JP 2009535789 A 20091001; KR 20090009294 A 20090122; MX 2008014158 A 20090116; US 2007295708 A1 20071227

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120403

2011-10-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20110905

2011-10-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23Q 7/22 20060101AFI20110830BHEP

2009-08-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23Q 7/22 20060101AFI20090227BHEP

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081204

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS